EP3206683 - NOVEL METHODS, COMPOUNDS, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ANESTHESIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of the General Counsel Building 170, Third Floor, Main Quad P.O. Box 20386 Stanford, CA 94305-2038 / US | For all designated states The United States Government as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | [2019/38] |
Former [2019/33] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of Technology Licensing 3000 El Camino Real Building Five, Suite 300 Palo Alto, CA 94306-2100 / US | ||
For all designated states The United States Government as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue NV Washington, DC 20420 / US | |||
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of Technology Licensing 3000 El Camino Real Building Five, Third Floor Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
For all designated states The United States Government as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue, N.W. Office of the General Counsel Washington, DC 20420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTACCINI, Edward John 1502 Chaumont Dr. San Jose, California 95118 / US | 02 /
DAVIES, Margaret Frances 780 E Meadow Dr. Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Comoglio, Elena, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15850730.1 | 16.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015US56067 | Priority number, date | US201462064670P | 16.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462064670 P | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016061538 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206683 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/402, A61K31/40, A61P23/00, C07D207/34 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
C07D207/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/402 (EP,US);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | A61K31/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE VERFAHREN, VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ANÄSTHESIE | [2017/34] | English: | NOVEL METHODS, COMPOUNDS, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR ANESTHESIA | [2017/34] | French: | NOUVEAUX PROCÉDÉS, COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS D'ANESTHÉSIE | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 15.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 15.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008002974 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 10,11,16,17 * compounds of cl. 6 *; | [X]WO2005080328 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [X] 12,13,16,17 * p. 28/29; p. 32 *; | [X] - Ende Li ET AL, "Copper-catalyzed synthesis of 1,2,4-trisubstituted pyrroles via cascade reactions of aryloxy-enynes with amines", RSC Advances, doi:10.1039/c3ra44595j, (20130101), page 22872, URL: http://www.rsc.org/suppdata/ra/c3/c3ra44595j/c3ra44595j.pdf, XP055470166 [X] 12,13,16,17 * p. 5 of supplementary information, compound 3g and further compounds on p. 4-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3ra44595j | [X] - Ke ET AL, "Supporting Information Oxidative Cross-Coupling/Cyclization to Build Polysubstituted Pyrroles from Terminal Alkynes and ?-Enamino Esters", Chemical Communications (Cambridge, United Kingdom) ( 2013 ), 49(68), 7549-7551, (20130101), URL: http://www.rsc.org/suppdata/cc/c3/c3cc43682a/c3cc43682a.pdf, (20180424), XP055470175 [X] 12,13,16,17 * see compounds on p. 14/15 * | [X] - DEMIRAYAK SEREF ET AL, "Synthesis and cytotoxic and analgesic activities of some 1,5-diaryl-3-ethoxycarbonylpyrrole derivatives", JOURNAL OF ENZYME INHIBITION AND MEDICINAL CHEMI, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, GB, (20060201), vol. 21, no. 1, doi:10.1080/14756360500472845, ISSN 1475-6366, pages 113 - 118, XP008084523 [X] 12,16,17 * see scheme 1, table I, compounds 2a-2c, 2f-2h * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14756360500472845 | [X] - DA EN ET AL, "Nucleophilic Phosphine-Catalyzed Intramolecular Michael Reactions of N -Allylic Substituted [alpha]-Amino Nitriles: Construction of Functionalized Pyrrolidine Rings via 5- endo -trig Cyclizations", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20140505), vol. 79, no. 10, doi:10.1021/jo500418s, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4456 - 4462, XP055470492 [X] 14-17 * p. 4458, scheme 3, compound 10; p. 4461, col. 1, last § * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo500418s | [A] - ERVIN PEJO ET AL, "Differential effects of etomidate and its pyrrole analogue carboetomidate on the adrenocortical and cytokine responses to endotoxemia* :", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE., US, (20120101), vol. 40, no. 1, doi:10.1097/CCM.0b013e31822d7924, ISSN 0090-3493, pages 187 - 192, XP055431528 [A] 1-17 * title, abstract; Fig. 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/CCM.0b013e31822d7924 | International search | [X]US2003013754 (MARTINS TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 45-50 * , entire document, especially: para [0110]; para [0120]. *; | [Y]US2006122230 (BERGGREN ANNA I K [SE], et al) [Y] 1-30, 58-59 * , entire document, especially: para [0001]; para [0093]; para [0162] *; | [Y]US2986564 (RICHARD RIPS, et al) [Y] 5, 15, 23 * , entire document, especially:col 2, Example I; col 3, Example II *; | [X] - PubChem, (20080922), Database accession no. 24894335, URL: NCBI [X] 31-37 * , Fig. * | [XY] - PubChem, (20070618), Database accession no. 16111410, URL: NCBI [X] 38-44, 51-57 * , Fig. * [Y] 58-59 | [Y] - PEJO et al., "Differential Effects of Etomidate and its Pyrrole Analogue Carboetomidate on the Adrenocortical and Cytokine Responses to Endotoxemia", Crit Care Med., (20120000), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 187 - 192, XP 055431528 [Y] 1-30 * , entire document, especially: * | [A] - "Anesthesia", WIKIPEDIA, (20140900), pages 1 - 2, XP009502132 [A] 24-27 |