EP3208631 - USER DEVICE AND DISTANCE ESTIMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUKAWA, Shimpei c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15850992.7 | 14.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015JP79082 | Priority number, date | JP20140213222 | 17.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014213222 | [2017/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016060177 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208631 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/06, G01S13/74, H04M1/00, H04W64/00, H04W92/18, H04W52/38, H04B17/27, // H04W88/02 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
G01S11/06 (EP,US);
H04B17/27 (US);
G01S13/74 (EP,US);
H04M1/00 (EP,US);
H04W52/383 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | G01S11/06, G01S13/74, H04M1/00, H04W64/00, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG UND ABSTANDSCHÄTZVERFAHREN | [2017/34] | English: | USER DEVICE AND DISTANCE ESTIMATION METHOD | [2017/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE DISTANCE | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | Translation filed | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010201573 (LAMMING MICHAEL GEORGE [US]) [X] 5-8,10 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 30] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0071] ** paragraphs [0089] - [0106] *; | [A]WO2013119077 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014177449 (NOVAK ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-4,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2014302791 (MOK YOUNG-JOONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0089] * | International search | [Y]JP2012510056 (Qualcomm, Inc.) [Y] 5-8, 10* , paragraphs [0010], [0030] & US 2010/0128617 A1 & WO 2010/065327 A1 paragraphs [0017], [0037] & EP 2368395 A1 & CN 102217393 A & KR 10-2011-0091879 A *; | [Y]WO2013047664 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6-9 * , paragraph [0048] & US 2014/0228057 A1 paragraph [0081] & EP 2763477 A1 & CN 103828451 A *; | [Y]WO2014123103 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0044]; fig. 1 & JP 2014-153209 A & CN 104956237 A * |