EP3206515 - ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE AND COMPONENTS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altria Client Services LLC 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230 / US | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPOWICZ, Peter c/o Altria Client Services LLC 601 East Jackson Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Docherty, Andrew John Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15851050.3 | 14.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015US55429 | Priority number, date | US201462064065P | 15.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462064065 P | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016061166 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3206515 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, H05B3/12, H05B3/42, H05B3/56, F22B1/28 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
F22B1/282 (EP,IL,US);
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
H05B3/0014 (IL,US);
H05B3/12 (EP,US);
H05B3/56 (EP,IL,US);
H05B6/10 (IL,US);
H05B6/36 (IL,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,US);
H05B2203/021 (EP,IL,US);
H05B2203/022 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | A24F47/00, H05B3/12, H05B3/42 | ||
Former IPC [2017/34] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE DAMPFVORRICHTUNG UND KOMPONENTEN DAVON | [2017/34] | English: | ELECTRONIC VAPING DEVICE AND COMPONENTS THEREOF | [2017/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VAPOTAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE ET ÉLÉMENTS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 21.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0371645 (AMP INC [US]); | [XY]EP0703735 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]); | [XY]DE69724559T (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]); | [A]EP2327318 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [XYI]US2013192623 (TUCKER CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [A]US2013213418 (TUCKER CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [A]GB2504074 (NICOVENTURES HOLDINGS LTD [GB]); | [XY]DE202013010986U (PIASECKI LESLAW [DE]) | International search | [A]US5878752 (ADAMS JOHN M [US], et al); | [XYA]US2013192623 (TUCKER CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [Y]US2013213418 (TUCKER CHRISTOPHER S [US], et al); | [Y]US2014064714 (QUES RAMOS VICTOR [ES], et al); | [Y]US2014074082 (DENIS SCOTT [US], et al); | [YA]CN203762288U (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO) | by applicant | US5878752 | US2013192623 |