EP3208697 - CONDUCTIVE FILM EVALUATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/34] | CONDUCTIVE FILM, DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED THEREWITH, AND CONDUCTIVE FILM EVALUATION METHOD | ||
[2021/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2021/40] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMI Kazuchika c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798 Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15851364.8 | 14.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015JP78976 | Priority number, date | JP20140210751 | 15.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014210751 | JP20150074618 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015074618 | [2017/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016060142 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208697 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208697 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044, G09F9/00, H01B5/14, H05K9/00 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (EP);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06T7/0004 (US);
G06T7/90 (US);
H01B5/14 (KR);
H04N23/88 (US);
H04N9/03 (US);
H05K9/00 (KR);
H05K9/0096 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04111 (US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP,KR,US);
G06T2207/10024 (US);
G06T2207/10056 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | G06F3/041, G09F9/00, H01B5/14, H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINES LEITFÄHIGEN FILMS | [2021/26] | English: | CONDUCTIVE FILM EVALUATION METHOD | [2021/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE FILM CONDUCTEUR | [2021/26] |
Former [2017/34] | LEITFÄHIGER FILM, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINES LEITFÄHIGEN FILMS | ||
Former [2017/34] | CONDUCTIVE FILM, DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED THEREWITH, AND CONDUCTIVE FILM EVALUATION METHOD | ||
Former [2017/34] | FILM CONDUCTEUR ET SON DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE FILM CONDUCTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2017 | Translation filed | 12.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 12.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.10.2021 | 18.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2015 | AL | 06.10.2021 | AT | 06.10.2021 | CY | 06.10.2021 | CZ | 06.10.2021 | DK | 06.10.2021 | EE | 06.10.2021 | ES | 06.10.2021 | FI | 06.10.2021 | HR | 06.10.2021 | IT | 06.10.2021 | LT | 06.10.2021 | LV | 06.10.2021 | MC | 06.10.2021 | MK | 06.10.2021 | NL | 06.10.2021 | PL | 06.10.2021 | RO | 06.10.2021 | RS | 06.10.2021 | SE | 06.10.2021 | SI | 06.10.2021 | SK | 06.10.2021 | SM | 06.10.2021 | IE | 14.10.2021 | LU | 14.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | CH | 31.10.2021 | LI | 31.10.2021 | BG | 06.01.2022 | NO | 06.01.2022 | GR | 07.01.2022 | IS | 06.02.2022 | PT | 07.02.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CY | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 14.10.2015 | |
AL | 06.10.2021 | ||
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
IT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SI | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 06.10.2021 | |
AT | 06.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
IE | 14.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
CH | 31.10.2021 | ||
LI | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
CZ | 06.10.2021 | ||
DK | 06.10.2021 | ||
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SK | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
LU | 14.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
EE | 06.10.2021 | ||
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RO | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
MC | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
SM | 06.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
NO | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
NL | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
SE | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
GR | 07.01.2022 | ||
IS | 06.02.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
ES | 06.10.2021 | ||
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
HR | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
LV | 06.10.2021 | ||
PL | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
PT | 07.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
FI | 06.10.2021 | ||
LT | 06.10.2021 | ||
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 06.10.2021 | |
RS | 06.10.2021 | ||
BG | 06.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 06.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012031746 (HWANG JI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0140] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0148]; figures 30-37 *; | [A]US2013021289 (CHEN WEI [US], et al) [A] 13* paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065]; figure 7 *; | [A]US2013255998 (IWAMI KAZUCHIKA [JP], et al) [A] 12 * paragraph [0071]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP2765842 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0196]; figures 9A,9B,9C *; | [I]WO2014123009 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [I] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014141867 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 8 * page 23 - page 26; figures 8-9 *; | [E]US2015342034 (IWAMI KAZUCHIKA [JP]) [E] 1-30 * the whole document * | International search | [EA]WO2015166924 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [EA] 1-30 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013146056 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * , entire text & US 2015/0015980 A1 entire text & EP 2833707 A1 & CN 104206044 A & KR 10-2014-0129335 A & TW 201342156 A *; | [A]WO2014097921 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-30 * , entire text & US 2015/0286323 A1 entire text & CN 104885139 A & TW 201435923 A & KR 10-2015-0087313 A *; | [A]JP2009117683 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-30 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012111819 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * , paragraph [0004] & US 2014/0054070 A1 paragraph [0008] & CN 103384870 A & KR 10-2014-0051135 A & TW 201240051 A * | Examination | EP3139368 |