EP3103381 - SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC ENDOSCOPE PROVIDED WITH SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIMURA Hironobu c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI Tomohisa c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA Hiroyuki c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15853210.1 | 18.08.2015 | [2016/50] | WO2015JP73112 | Priority number, date | JP20140213605 | 20.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014213605 | [2016/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016063603 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103381 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/04, G02B23/24, H04N5/225 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61B1/051 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (US);
G02B23/24 (US);
G02B23/2484 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/54 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES ENDOSKOP MIT EINER DERARTIGEN FESTKÖRPERBILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/50] | English: | SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC ENDOSCOPE PROVIDED WITH SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE | [2016/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET ENDOSCOPE ÉLECTRONIQUE POURVU DU DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2016/50] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2016 | Translation filed | 30.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 30.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1154512 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 6a, 6b *; | [A]JP2003123882 (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 1-4* figures 7,8 *; | [Y]US2004060171 (EDWARDSEN STEPHEN DODGE [NO], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figures 3a, 3b *; | [Y]US2004072468 (ENGQUIST DAVID T [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0 20]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1920708 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * figure 4 *; | [Y]US2011211053 (NAKAYAMA TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * reference signs 10, 12, 31, 23;; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP2674095 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * reference signs 40, 42;; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]JPH0943520 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1-10 * , paragraph [0047]; fig. 6 & US 5810714 A & EP 0739602 A1 *; | [Y]JP2003258142 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-10* , paragraphs [0047] to [0050]; fig. 6 & US 2003/0231088 A1 * |