EP3213850 - BRAZING FURNACE AND BRAZING METHOD FOR ALUMINUM MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Yasunaga c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 02 /
YANAGAWA, Yutaka c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | 03 /
SAKODA, Shoichi c/o UACJ Corporation 1-7-2 Otemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15854432.0 | 17.07.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP70550 | Priority number, date | JP20140218831 | 28.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014218831 | JP20140228110 | 10.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014228110 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016067682 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213850 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/19, B23K1/008, B23K1/20, B23K3/047, F27D7/06, F27D13/00, // B23K103/10 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B23K1/008 (EP,US);
B23K1/19 (EP,US);
B23K1/203 (EP,US);
B23K3/047 (EP,US);
B23K31/02 (US);
F27B5/02 (EP,US);
F27B5/04 (EP,US);
F27B5/16 (EP,US);
F27D13/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | B23K1/19, B23K1/008, B23K31/02, B23K101/02, B23K101/14, B23K103/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | LÖTOFEN UND LÖTVERFAHREN FÜR ALUMINIUMMATERIAL | [2017/36] | English: | BRAZING FURNACE AND BRAZING METHOD FOR ALUMINUM MATERIAL | [2017/36] | French: | FOUR DE BRASAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE BRASAGE D'UN MATÉRIAU D'ALUMINIUM | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | Translation filed | 17.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 17.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5471749 (MITSUBISHI ALUMINIUM, et al) [X] 1-10,13 * examples 1-3 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 11,12; | [Y]JPS635868 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2006037137 (DENSO CORP, et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [T] - R. Mundt, "TALAT Lecture 4601 Introduction to Brazing of Aluminium Alloys", (19941231), pages 1 - 24, URL: http://core.materials.ac.uk/repository/eaa/talat/4601.pdf, (20160727), XP055291534 [T] * the whole document * | International search | [YA]JPS5762859 (CHUGAI RO KOGYO KAISHA LTD) [Y] 1-11, 13 * , page 2, upper left column, line 15 to lower right column, line 18; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JPS57106469 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 1-11, 13 * , page 3, upper left column, line 6 to upper right column, line 8; fig. 2 (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2014049746 (YAMATO SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 5-6, 13 * , paragraph [0063] (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2010219158 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 5-6, 13 * , paragraph [0020] & DE 102010015841 A & CN 101835349 A * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2014136223 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 9, 13 * , paragraph [0037] & WO 2014/112425 A1 * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2014055338 (UACJ CORP) [Y] 9, 13 * , paragraphs [0060] to [0061] (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2014185386 (MITSUBISHI ALUMINIUM) [Y] 10, 13 * , paragraph [0009] (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JP2014104509 (UACJ CORP) [Y] 10, 13 * , paragraph [0014] (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [YA]JPS6381839 (NEC CORP) [Y] 11, 13 * , page 2, upper right column, lines 4 to 7; page 3, upper left column, lines 6 to 20; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 12; | [A]US2013062399 (MCQUIRK MALCOLM ROGER [GB]) [A] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0031] to [0035]; fig. 1 to 3 & GB 2479553 A & WO 2011/128624 A1 * |