EP3186327 - OPTICALLY CLEAR ADHESIVE AND OPTICAL LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUWA, Toshihiro 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 02 /
NOZAKI, Yusuke 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 03 /
NAKAJIMA, Shinya 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 04 /
NAKADA, Aya 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 05 /
AMARI, Shingo 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Shunsuke 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | 07 /
TING, Chun-Yi 6F No. 95 Dunhua South Road Sec. 2 10682 Taipei / TW | 08 /
KINOSHITA, Yasuhiro 6-7-29 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8684 / JP | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15855924.5 | 26.08.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015US46881 | Priority number, date | JP20140175736 | 29.08.2014 Original published format: JP 2014175736 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016069097 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3186327 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/00, C09J133/04, C09J133/26, C09J7/00, C09J11/08, G06F3/042, G06F3/044, B32B27/30, C09J4/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C09J133/066 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/12 (KR,US);
C09J4/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/27] | C09J133/00, C09J133/04, C09J133/26, C09J7/00, C09J11/08, G06F3/042, G06F3/044, B32B27/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | OPTISCH KLARER KLEBSTOFF UND OPTISCHES LAMINAT | [2017/27] | English: | OPTICALLY CLEAR ADHESIVE AND OPTICAL LAMINATE | [2017/27] | French: | ADHÉSIF OPTIQUEMENT TRANSPARENT ET STRATIFIÉ OPTIQUE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 06.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6013722 (YANG JIE [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US2012157611 (KATAMI HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2762544 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO9937728 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-17, Tables 1-7; claims) *; | [A]WO2012024217 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-4, Tables 1-4; claims) *; | [A]US2012094037 (BANBA TOMOHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-5, Table 1, claims) *; | [A]US2012115976 (IGARASHI KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-7, Tables 1-2.claims). *; | [A]WO2012112856 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-9; Tables 1-2, claims) *; | [A]WO2013181030 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * (See Examples 1-35, Tables 1-19, claims) *; | [A] - PEYKOVA, Y. et al., "Adhesive Properties of Acrylate Copolymers: Effect of the Nature of the Substrate and Copolymer Functionality", International Journal of Adhesion & Adhesives, (20120000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijadhadh.2011.12.001, pages 107 - 116, XP 028891719 [A] 1-12 * . (See Table 1; page 108, column 2, para 3-page 115, column 2, first para) * | [A] - TAGHIZADEH, S. M. et al., "Synthesis and Optimization of a Four-component Acrylic-based Copolymer as Pressure Sensitive Adhesive", Iranian Polymer Journal, (20100000), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 343 - 352, XP055426129 [A] 1-12 * . (See abstract, page 345, column 1, first para-page 351, column 1, first para) * |