EP3216034 - INTRINSICALLY SAFE TRANSFORMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hubbell Incorporated 40 Waterview Drive Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARDER, Kashem Abul 6/48 Robert Street Jesmond, NSW 2299 / AU | 02 /
CHAN, Peter Lim Sim 6 Karloon Road West Pennant Hills, NSW 2125 / AU | 03 /
CHONG, Matthew John 51 Rockley Avenue Baulkham Hills, NSW 2153 / AU | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Bryn Aarflot AS Patent Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Midttun, Gisle Johan Bryn Aarflot A/S Stortingsgaten 8 P.O. Box 449 Sentrum 0104 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 15857014.3 | 30.10.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015US58189 | Priority number, date | US201462074501P | 03.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462074501 P | [2017/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016073291 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216034 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/24, H01F27/28, H01F27/32, H01F27/34, H01F27/38 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
H01F27/325 (EP,US);
H01F27/24 (EP,US);
H01F27/289 (EP,US);
H01F27/324 (EP,US);
H01F27/346 (EP,US);
H01F27/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | H01F27/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | EIGENSICHERE TRANSFORMATOREN | [2017/37] | English: | INTRINSICALLY SAFE TRANSFORMERS | [2017/37] | French: | TRANSFORMATEURS À SÉCURITÉ INTRINSÈQUE | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 12.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 22.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS60226112 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [I] 10-18 * paragraph [0001]; figure 5 *; | [XI]EP0196857 (RCA CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * [I] 5-7; | [A]US5696477 (YAMAMORI MASAYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-27* abstract *; | [XI]EP0944099 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * [I] 5-7; | [A]GB2369933 (DELTA ELECTRONICS INC [TW], et al) [A] 5-7,14-16,24-26 * abstract *; | [I]US6549431 (ODELL ARTHUR B [US], et al) [I] 10-18 * abstract *; | [XI]US2006132272 (KITAHARA SATORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1 * [I] 5-7; | [A]EP1717826 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * abstract *; | [XI]US2009066290 (ALTEKRUSE KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0049]; figures 6,7,8,11 * * paragraph [0050] * [I] 5-7; | [XI]US2010231342 (ZENG ZHONG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * [I] 5-7,20-27; | [A]WO2011124761 (SALCOMP OYJ [FI], et al) [A] 20-27 * figure 1b *; | [A]CN202013796U (SONG SHUN ELECTRONIC SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 20-27 * abstract *; | [XI]US2013002390 (NAM KI HUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9 * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0125] * [I] 5-7 | International search | [Y]US2002167388 (USUI HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-18, 20-27 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0008], [0009], [0018], [0031], [0051], [0061], Fig. 1, 2, 5 *; | [Y]US2011018676 (YOUNG GEORGE [IE], et al) [Y] 1-18, 20-27 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0004], [0012], [0016], [0023], [0071] *; | [A]US2004257190 (PECK JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-18, 20-27 * , entire document *; | [A]US5220304 (HO JOSEPH K P [HK]) [A] 1-18, 20-27 * , entire document * | by applicant | JPS60226112 | EP0944099 | US2013002390 | US2010231342 | US2006132272 | EP0196857 | US2009066290 |