EP3217663 - VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/37] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
[2020/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Chan-yul F6 29-4 Samsung-ro 277beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16521 / KR | 02 /
MIN, Jung-hye 104-401 15 Yehyeon-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17103 / KR | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15857835.1 | 06.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015KR11873 | Priority number, date | US201462075987P | 06.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462075987 P | [2017/37] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016072775 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217663 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/103, H04N19/139, H04N19/176, H04N19/46, H04N19/463, H04N19/186, H04N19/157 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
H04N19/103 (EP);
H04N19/107 (CN,KR,US);
H04N19/10 (US);
H04N19/105 (EP,US);
H04N19/122 (CN);
H04N19/13 (CN);
H04N19/139 (EP,US);
H04N19/157 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/182 (US);
H04N19/184 (CN);
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/463 (EP,US);
H04N19/523 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | H04N19/10, H04N19/107, H04N19/105, H04N19/139, H04N19/176, H04N19/46, H04N19/463, H04N19/186, H04N19/157 | ||
Former IPC [2017/37] | H04N19/10, H04N19/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VIDEODECODIERUNG | [2020/27] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE VIDÉO | [2020/27] |
Former [2017/37] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VIDEOCODIERUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VIDEODECODIERUNG | ||
Former [2017/37] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND VIDEO DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [2017/37] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE DE VIDÉO, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉCODAGE DE VIDÉO | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2017 | Translation filed | 10.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 10.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2007098067 (KIM SO-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,10-12 * paragraphs [0030] , [0037] , [0044] , [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0064]; figures 2,6,7,8 * [A] 2,3 [I] 7; | [XI]WO2008004940 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12 * page 6, line 24 - page 12, line 27; figure 1 * * page 26, line 7 - page 27, line 22; figure 5 * [I] 3; | [I]US2014072041 (SEREGIN VADIM [US], et al) [I] 1,10-12 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0126]; figures 5,6 * | International search | [XA]KR20070047522 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1, 4, 7, 10-12, 16 * See page 10, line 12-page 11, line 14, figures 3a-8 and claims 1-4, 9-12, 16-19, 21-24. * [A] 2-3, 5-6, 8-9, 13-15; | [A]KR101050828B (THOMSON LICENSING) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0069]-[0070] and figures 9a-9b. *; | [A]KR20020042935 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See figure 2 and claim 1. *; | [A]US2012230405 (AN JICHENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0043] and figures 4-5 . *; | [A]KR20080066706 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0087]-[0099] and figures 7A-7D. * |