EP3215281 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING OF GRANULAR MATERIAL AND USE OF THE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFYING FLY ASH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fatec Oy Lyhyenrannantie 11 71800 Siilinjärvi / FI | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIKKINEN-MUSTONEN, Aino Lyhyenrannantie 11 FI-71800 Siilinjärvi / FI | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Salomäki, Juha Kari Ensio Salomaki Oy Kankurinkatu 4-6 05800 Hyvinkää / FI | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15857925.0 | 07.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015FI50769 | Priority number, date | FI20140005978 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: FI 20145978 | [2017/37] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016071575 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3215281 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B07B4/00, B07B9/02, B07B13/04, B07B1/00, B07B15/00, B03B9/04, C04B18/08 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
B07B4/00 (EP,FI);
B03B9/04 (EP);
B07B1/005 (EP);
B07B13/04 (FI);
B07B15/00 (EP);
B07B9/02 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B18/08, C04B20/026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | B07B4/00, B07B9/02, B07B13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON KÖRNIGEM MATERIAL UND VERWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KLASSIFIZIERUNG VON FLUGASCHE | [2017/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HANDLING OF GRANULAR MATERIAL AND USE OF THE METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLASSIFYING FLY ASH | [2017/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT LA MANIPULATION DE MATÉRIAU GRANULAIRE ET UTILISATION DU PROCÉDÉ ET DE L'APPAREIL POUR CLASSER DES CENDRES VOLANTES | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2022 | 30.11.2022 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2023 | 30.11.2023 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19505385 (RETHMANN KREISLAUFWIRTSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,12-14 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 18 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 29 * * column 5, line 20 - line 26 * * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 11; figures 1-4; claims 1-22 *; | [XYI]EP1372860 (SCHONS GEORG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-3; claims 1-28 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 5,6; | [X]DE102005005545 (REITMEIR ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,12-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0049] ** paragraph [0072]; figures 1-19; claims 1-23 *; | [X]DE202009013552U (IMRO MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,12-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-10e; claims 1-21 *; | [XYI]WO2014041246 (FATEC OY [FI]) [X] 1-4,7,12-15 * page 1, line 15 - line 26 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 17 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 23 * * page 9, line 1 - page 12, line 27 * * page 13, line 25 - page 21, line 10; figures 1-7; claims 1-18 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 5,6 | International search | [X]DE19505385 (RETHMANN KREISLAUFWIRTSCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4, 8-11, 16-18 * the whole document, especially column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 11; figure 4 *; | [X]US2004111958 (OATES DAVID BRIDSON [CA], et al) [X] 1, 8 * the whole document, especially paragraphs [0002], [0009], [0010], [0032] and [0037]; figure 1 *; | [X]US6758342 (HARADA TOSHIKAZU [JP]) [X] 1, 8* the whole document, especially abstract; column 6, lines 27-37; column 7, lines 18-30; column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 27; figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]WO2004067468 (NELLMAPIUS JOHN HUGO [ZA]) [X] 1, 5, 8, 19 * the whole document, especially abstract; page 2, line 8 - page 4, line 25; page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 10: claims 1-10: figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO2014041246 (FATEC OY [FI]) [X] 1, 5-8, 12-15, 19 * the whole document, especially page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 27; page 14, line 19 - page 16, line 23; figures 1-7 * |