EP3176249 - GAS-BUBBLE SPRAY MEMBER, GAS-LIQUID SPRAY MEMBER, LOCAL ABLATION DEVICE, AND LOCAL INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2017/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANISHI Yoko c/o SHIBAURA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 7-5 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8548 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI Kazuki c/o SHIBAURA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 7-5 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8548 / JP | 03 /
OMI Shun c/o SHIBAURA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 7-5 Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8548 / JP | [2017/23] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15857966.4 | 04.11.2015 | [2017/23] | WO2015JP80998 | Priority number, date | JP20140226699 | 07.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014226699 | [2017/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016072408 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3176249 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12N15/09, C12M1/42 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
C12M35/04 (EP,RU,US);
A01G7/06 (RU,US);
C12M3/006 (KR);
A23L13/50 (RU,US);
A23L13/72 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C12N15/87 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/23] | C12M1/00, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] | Title | German: | GASBLASENSPRÜHELEMENT, GASFLÜSSIGKEITSSPRÜHELEMENT, LOKALE ABLATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND LOKALE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/23] | English: | GAS-BUBBLE SPRAY MEMBER, GAS-LIQUID SPRAY MEMBER, LOCAL ABLATION DEVICE, AND LOCAL INJECTION DEVICE | [2017/23] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE PULVÉRISATION DE BULLES DE GAZ, ÉLÉMENT DE PULVÉRISATION DE GAZ-LIQUIDE, DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION LOCALE, ET DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION LOCALE | [2017/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2017 | Translation filed | 03.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/23] | 03.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013129657 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al); | [P]EP2821020 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) | International search | [YA]WO2013129657 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP], et al); | [PA]WO2015030038 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]); |