EP3236030 - CO2 RECOVERY DEVICE OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEEDA Masato c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
ORITA Hisayuki c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
ABE Motoyuki c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
SUKEGAWA Yoshihiro c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
ORYOJI Kazuhiro c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 06 /
OKUDA Yuuki c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15858502.6 | 07.10.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015JP78435 | Priority number, date | JP20140230285 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014230285 | [2017/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016076041 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236030 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/08, B01D53/62, F01N3/10, F01N3/24, F01N9/00, F01N11/00, F01N13/00, F01N5/02, B01D53/92, C01B32/50 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
F01N5/025 (EP,US);
B01D53/0462 (EP,US);
B01D53/62 (EP,US);
C01B32/50 (EP,US);
F01N11/00 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/08 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
F01N3/0857 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/10 (EP,US);
F01N3/103 (EP,US);
F01N3/24 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D53/92 (EP,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
F01N2240/04 (EP,US);
F01N2240/18 (EP,US);
F01N2240/30 (EP,US);
F01N2240/34 (EP,US);
Y02C20/20 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | F01N3/08, B01D53/62, F01N3/10, F01N3/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | CO2-RÜCKGEWINNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2017/43] | English: | CO2 RECOVERY DEVICE OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CO2 D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2017 | Translation filed | 06.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 20.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/21] | 03.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2665544 (SAUDI ARABIAN OIL CO [SA]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0028] - [ 0030] - [0099] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 4A, 4B * [I] 4-8,10; | [XI]US2013298761 (HAMAD ESAM ZAKI [SA]) [X] 1-3,9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0037] - [ 0051] - [0140] * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 * [I] 4-8,10; | [A]JP2010235736 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0041] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013220130 (IHMS DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2009269983 (NAKAMATSU YOSHIRO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US8413420 (ZAROMB SOLOMON [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2009269983 (NAKAMATSU YOSHIRO) [Y] 1-6, 8-10 * , abstract; paragraph [0007] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013220953 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al) [Y] 1-6, 8-10 * , abstract; paragraph [0020] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2011179339 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-6, 8-10 * , paragraph [0044] & DE 102011004796 A1 *; | [Y]JPH11207126 (INST OF RESEARCH & INNOVATION) [Y] 1 * , paragraph [0031]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014201621 (NAKAMATS COM DR) [A] 1-6, 8-10 * , abstract (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012215112 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 7 * , paragraph [0019] (Family: none) * |