EP3218581 - MONOPROPELLANT DRIVEN HYDRAULIC PRESSURE SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bastion Technologies, Inc. 17625 El Camino Real Suite 330 Houston, TX 77058 / US | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPPEDGE, Charles Don 15474 Peermont Houston, TX 77062 / US | 02 /
REEVES, Joseph 1702 Lapaz Court League City, TX 77573 / US | 03 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Jayant 15307 Coastal Oak Court Houston, TX 77059 / US | 04 /
HERNANDEZ, Jorge 2510 Blossom Bay Court Houston, TX 77059 / US | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Bryn Aarflot AS Patent Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2022/38] | Protector IP AS Pilestredet 33 0166 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2017/38] | Protector IP Consultants AS Oscarsgate 20 0352 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 15859410.1 | 16.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015US60930 | Priority number, date | US201462079895P | 14.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462079895 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016077836 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3218581 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3218581 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01B11/04, F01B23/08 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
F41A1/04 (EP,US);
F02K9/605 (US);
C06D5/04 (EP,US);
E21B41/00 (EP,US);
F02K9/425 (US);
F02K9/44 (US);
F02K9/68 (US);
F15B7/08 (EP,US);
F41B9/0043 (EP,US);
F15B2211/218 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOPROPELLANTANGETRIEBENE HYDRAULIKDRUCKVERSORGUNG | [2017/38] | English: | MONOPROPELLANT DRIVEN HYDRAULIC PRESSURE SUPPLY | [2017/38] | French: | ALIMENTATION DE PRESSION HYDRAULIQUE ENTRAÎNÉE PAR MONERGOL | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 08.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2015 | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | BG | 21.09.2022 | CY | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | MK | 21.09.2022 | MT | 21.09.2022 | NL | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | IE | 16.11.2022 | LU | 16.11.2022 | FR | 21.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | DE | 01.06.2023 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 16.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
BG | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 16.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
MK | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 16.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 16.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CY | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.09.2022 | ||
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
FR | 21.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
IE | 16.11.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
DE | 01.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
MC | 21.09.2022 | ||
NL | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005039914 (PURKIS DANIEL G [GB], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 25] , [0 32] *; | [Y]US2005044851 (GOLDFARB MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 44] , [0 45] *; | [Y]US2006254763 (TIPS TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [Y] 12-15 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 80] *; | [Y]US2009211239 (ASKELAND TOM KJETILL [NO]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] *; | [Y]US2013220161 (COPPEDGE CHARLES DON [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0018] , [0 20] , [0 21] , [0 22] , [0 41] *; | [XP]WO2015085200 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [XP] 1,4,10* paragraphs [0019] , [0 29] , [0 30] * | International search | [X]CN100419214C (UNIV TSINGHUA GRADUATE SCHOOL [CN]) [X] 1-16 * ; pages 6-8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN101377150B (UNIV TSINGHUA GRADUATE SCHOOL) [A] 1-16 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2013220161 (COPPEDGE CHARLES DON [US], et al) [A] 1-16* ; entire document * |