EP3220691 - NETWORK NODE SELECTION AND ACTIVATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIAO, Ting ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YU, Guanghui ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Xing ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LI, Ruimei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 15859554.6 | 17.08.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015CN87273 | Priority number, date | CN201410638100 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410638100 | [2017/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016074515 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220691 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3220691 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, // H04W84/00, H04W84/04, H04W24/08 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (KR,US);
H04W48/20 (KR,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W84/005 (EP,US);
H04W84/047 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | H04W48/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NETZWERKKNOTENAUSWAHL UND AKTIVIERUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2017/38] | English: | NETWORK NODE SELECTION AND ACTIVATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2017/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION ET D'ACTIVATION DE NOEUD DE RÉSEAU | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2017 | Translation filed | 19.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 19.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2015 | AL | 12.05.2021 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | TR | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IE | 17.08.2021 | LU | 17.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.08.2015 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 17.08.2015 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 17.08.2015 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IE | 17.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
LU | 17.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2010080013 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 3,8,12,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] - [0 44] - [0049] - [0 55] , [0 75] , [ 107] - [0108]; figures 2,12; claim 1 * [A] 1,2,4-7,9-11,13,14; | [YA]US2012142328 (AWONIYI OLUFUNMILOLA O [US], et al) [Y] 8,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 72]; figure 8; claims 1-3 *[A] 1-7,9-14; | [XYI]US2013308520 (DAMNJANOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 28] , [0 51] - [0070]; figures 7,8; claims 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,8,12,15 [I] 2,3,5,7,9,11,14; | [YA]US2014269417 (YU LING [FI], et al) [Y] 4,8,12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 74] - [0075] - [0 87] - [0090]; figure 5 * [A] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13,14 | International search | [A]CN1596023 (UNIV BEIHANG [CN]) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2006092879 (JEONG SEONG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-20* , the whole document *; | [X]CN103686946 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS) [X] 1-20 * , claims 1-10 * |