EP3091383 - OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON, OPTICAL FIBER CABLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Soichiro c/o FUJIKURA LTD. Sakura Plant 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
ISAJI, Mizuki c/o FUJIKURA LTD. Sakura Plant 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
OSATO, Ken c/o FUJIKURA LTD. Sakura Plant 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Keenway Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2016/45] | Heine, Christian Klaus KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15861486.7 | 05.11.2015 | [2016/45] | WO2015JP81129 | Priority number, date | JP20140235500 | 20.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014235500 | [2016/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016080195 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091383 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3091383 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G02B6/4482 (EP,US);
G02B6/44 (EP,US);
G02B6/4403 (EP,US);
G02B6/4404 (EP,US);
G02B6/4405 (EP,US);
G02B6/448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASFASERBAND, GLASFASERKABEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GLASFASERBANDS | [2016/45] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON, OPTICAL FIBER CABLE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING OPTICAL FIBER RIBBON | [2016/45] | French: | RUBAN DE FIBRE OPTIQUE, CÂBLE À FIBRE OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE RUBAN DE FIBRE OPTIQUE | [2016/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2016 | Translation filed | 07.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 28.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21196647.8 / EP3943995 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | TR | 15.09.2021 | LU | 05.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
LU | 05.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CA2911402 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 8, paragraph 5; figures 1,3 * [I] 3; | [XA]US2013343712 (MATSUZAWA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 5,6 * paragraphs [0037] , [0042] , [0045] , [0052]; figures 4,5,12 * [A] 3; | [A]US2008199134 (COOK THOMAS C [US]) [A] 1-6 * figure 3 * | International search | [A]JP2013097350 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0017], [0027]; fig. 6 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0233010U (The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-6 * , page 5, line 6 to page 7, line 14; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014157382 (FUJIKURA LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0029], [0035] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 3, 5 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012234122 (FUJIKURA LTD) [A] 1-6 * , fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]US5379363 (BONICEL JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-6 * , column 3, line 1 to column 4, line 37; fig. 1 to 4 & EP 581680 A1 * |