EP3221265 - PREPARATION OF CHITOSAN-BASED MICROPOROUS COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND ITS APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perma-Fix Environmental Services, Inc. 8302 Dunwoody Place, Suite 250 Atlanta, Georgia 30350 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASAN, Shameem 9261 NW 24th St. Sunrise, FL 33322 / US | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/39] | 01 /
HASAN, Shameem 215 Enchanted Ct. Apt. 2 Manchester, Missouri 63021 / US | Representative(s) | Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstraße 34 80796 München / DE | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15861884.3 | 19.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61454 | Priority number, date | US201414547201 | 19.11.2014 Original published format: US201414547201 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081675 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221265 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C01F13/00, B01J20/24, B01J20/26, B01J20/30, B01J20/34 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C01G39/003 (EP);
B01J20/22 (KR);
B01D15/08 (RU);
B01D59/26 (KR);
B01J20/041 (KR);
B01J20/046 (KR);
B01J20/24 (EP,RU);
B01J20/267 (EP);
B01J20/28059 (KR);
B01J20/3071 (KR);
B01J20/3078 (KR);
B01J20/3085 (EP,KR);
B01J20/34 (RU);
B01J20/3425 (EP);
B01J20/3475 (EP);
C01G39/00 (RU);
C01G99/003 (EP);
G21F9/12 (RU);
B01J2220/485 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | C01F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES MIKROPORÖSEN VERBUNDSTOFFES AUF CHITOSANBASIS UND DESSEN ANWENDUNG | [2017/39] | English: | PREPARATION OF CHITOSAN-BASED MICROPOROUS COMPOSITE MATERIAL AND ITS APPLICATIONS | [2017/39] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE MATIÈRE COMPOSITE MICROPOREUSE À BASE DE CHITOSANE ET SES APPLICATIONS | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/39] | 24.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6764981 (EOFF LARRY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2004182576 (REDDY B RAGHAVA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] *; | [Y]WO2012125994 (PERMA FIX ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-22 * * page 13, line 1 - line 8 * | International search | [Y]US5208166 (SAUNDERS MARY S [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * col. 4; In 34-37 *; | [A]US5599916 (DUTKIEWICZ JACEK [US], et al) [A] 1-24* entire document *; | [A]US2009291912 (TIJSMA EDZE JAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-24 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013039822 (HASAN SHAMEEM [US]) [Y] 1 21 * para[0031]; para[0035]; para[0036]; para[0037]; para[0054]; para[0075]; para[0122]; para[0126]; para[0129]; para[0133]; claim 11-12, 16-20 *; | [A]US2013045182 (GONG GLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * entire documont *; | [A]US2013069000 (ANUPAMA [IN], et al) [A] 1-24 * entire document * |