EP3225073 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PAIRING A WEARABLE DEVICE AND A SMART DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INGALE, Mangesh Abhimanyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
TUKKA, Vijaya Kumar c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
JANG, Jaehyuk c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
SHARMA, Diwakar c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15862185.4 | 23.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015KR12588 | Priority number, date | IN2014KOL1243 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: IN 1243KO2014 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016085214 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225073 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/02, H04W12/06, H04W76/02, H04L12/18, H04L29/08, H04L12/28, H04W12/08, H04W4/00, H04W4/20 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
H04W4/38 (EP,US);
H04L12/2809 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W12/08 (EP,US);
H04W12/33 (EP,US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | H04W88/02, H04W12/06, H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PAARUNG EINER WEARABLE-VORRICHTUNG UND EINER INTELLIGENTEN VORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PAIRING A WEARABLE DEVICE AND A SMART DEVICE | [2017/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE JUMELAGE D'UN DISPOSITIF VESTIMENTAIRE ET D'UN DISPOSITIF INTELLIGENT | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 17.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012317024 (RAHMAN HOSAIN SADEQUR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0035] - [0038] *; | [X]US2014279528 (SLABY JIRI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0027] - [0032] - [0060] - [0061] *; | [X]WO2014147713 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0022] , [0030] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 1,4 * | International search | [Y]US2011167262 (ROSS MARK A [US], et al) [Y] 6, 14 * See paragraph [0074]; and figure 5. *; | [A]US2014089672 (LUNA MICHAEL EDWARD SMITH [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0027]; claims 1-11; and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2014244710 (SHARMA SANDEEP [US], et al) [Y] 2-5, 10-13 * See paragraphs [0090]-[0093]; and claim 1. *; | [XY]US2014279528 (SLABY JIRI [US], et al) [X] 1, 7-9, 15-17 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0059]; claims 1-15; and figures 1-7. * [Y] 2-6, 10-14; | [A]US2014329497 (SANZGIRI AMEYA M [US], et al) [A] 1-17* See paragraphs [0039]-[0129]; claims 1-7; and figures 2-4. * |