EP3225456 - MOVING BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states Chiba Institute of Technology 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0016 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHIAI Hirotoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
ANDO Mitsuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
YANG Seongjun c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 04 /
NAGAMINE Noboru c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 05 /
TAKAYANAGI Wataru c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 06 /
KATO Yukihiro c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | 07 /
FURUTA Takayuki c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | 08 /
SHIMIZU Masaharu c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi 275-0016, CHIBA / JP | 09 /
YAMATO Hideaki c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | 10 /
TODA Kengo c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | 11 /
KODACHI Takashi c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
OCHIAI Hirotoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | ||
02 /
ANDO Mitsuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
03 /
YANG Seongjun c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
04 /
NAGAMINE Noboru c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
05 /
TAKAYANAGI Wataru c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
06 /
KATO Yukihiro c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | |||
07 /
FURUTA Takayuki c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | |||
08 /
SHIMIZU Masaharu c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | |||
09 /
YAMATO Hideaki c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | |||
10 /
TODA Kengo c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | |||
11 /
KODACHI Takashi c/o CHIBA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 2-17-1 Tsudanuma Narashino-shi Chiba 275-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/07] |
Former [2017/40] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15862595.4 | 26.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015JP83269 | Priority number, date | JP20140238626 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014238626 | [2017/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084910 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225456 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225456 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, A61G5/04, B60L3/00, B60L15/10, B60W30/09, B60W30/095, G01S17/93, G01S7/48, G01S17/02, G01S17/42, G01S17/89, // G01S7/497 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
B60L3/0015 (EP);
A61G5/04 (EP,US);
B60L15/10 (EP);
B60L15/20 (EP);
B60W30/09 (EP);
B60W30/0953 (EP);
G01S17/04 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP);
G01S7/4808 (EP);
B60L2200/34 (EP);
B60L2240/12 (EP);
B60T2201/022 (EP);
B60Y2200/84 (EP);
B60Y2300/09 (EP);
B60Y2300/095 (EP);
B60Y2300/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B60L15/20, A61G5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHER KÖRPER | [2017/40] | English: | MOVING BODY | [2017/40] | French: | CORPS MOBILE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2017 | Translation filed | 24.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 24.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2015 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | NL | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.11.2015 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
NL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH0386005 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2007046449 (KOIKE HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0058] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 2,4-7; | [IA]WO2014156222 (SHARP KK [JP]) [I] 1-3 * the whole document *[A] 4-7 | International search | [Y]JPH0386005 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-5 * , page 2, lower right column, line 19 to page 5, upper right column, line 14 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000187799 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraph [0011]; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2003114277 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 4-5 * , paragraphs [0015] to [0021] (Family: none) * [A] 6-7; | [YA]JP2011022080 (OPTEX CO LTD) [Y] 4-5 * , paragraphs [0043] to [0056] & US 2012/0113410 A1 paragraphs [0056] to [0070] & WO 2011/007855 A1 & EP 2455780 A1 *[A] 6-7; | [Y]JP2014121190 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 2-5 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0030], [0033] (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2014191485 (SHARP KK) [Y] 4-5 * , paragraphs [0025], [0047] to [0049] & US 2015/0348416 A1 paragraphs [0040], [0065] to [0067] & WO 2014/156222 A1 * [A] 6-7 |