EP3226449 - FRAMER, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND FRAMING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA, Kei c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
KOTANIGAWA, Takashi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
HAMANO, Takafumi c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
ARAI, Kaoru c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 05 /
YOKOTA, Masahiro c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 06 /
MAEDA, Hideki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 07 /
YAMADA, Yoshiaki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 08 /
OHARA, Takuya c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 09 /
SHINTAKU, Kengo c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11 Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15862960.0 | 27.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015JP83379 | Priority number, date | JP20140241493 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014241493 | [2017/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084934 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226449 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3226449 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16, H04B10/03, H04J3/00, H04B10/50, H04J14/08 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04J14/0298 (EP);
H04B10/50 (US);
H04B10/03 (US);
H04J14/0263 (EP);
H04J14/08 (US);
H04J3/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | H04J3/16, H04B10/03, H04J3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FRAMER, OPTISCHE ÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM FRAMING | [2017/40] | English: | FRAMER, OPTICAL TRANSMISSION DEVICE, AND FRAMING METHOD | [2017/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAMAGE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2017 | Translation filed | 22.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 22.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2015 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | GB | 27.11.2019 | IE | 27.11.2019 | LU | 27.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013216217 (SHARMA NISHANT [IN], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0014] ** paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]WO2013125621 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [P]EP2819362 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0168] * * paragraph [0238] *; | [X] - BO WEN ET AL, "Routing, wavelength and time-slot-assignment algorithms for wavelength-routed optical WDM/TDM networks", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY., US, (20050901), vol. 23, no. 9, doi:10.1109/JLT.2005.854039, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 2598 - 2609, XP055451393 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 2600, column l, paragraph A - column r, paragraph B * * page 2601, column l, line 1 - line 11 * * page 2603, column l, line 19 - line 28 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2005.854039 | International search | [Y]JP2010136380 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM) [Y] 1-5 * , abstract; paragraphs [0032] to [0156] & US 2010/0142947 A1 abstract; paragraphs [0058] to [0185] & KR 10-2010-0066358 A *; | [Y]JP2012004839 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-5 * , abstract; paragraphs [0001] to [0010], [0050] to [0092] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012119999 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [Y] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0031], [0034], [0043], [0044] (Family: none) *; | [Y]US2012189304 (LIN YI [CN], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , abstract; fig. 1, 2 & WO 2011/038673 A1 & EP 2472767 A1 & CN 102036132 A *; | [Y]JP2012209877 (FUJITSU TELECOM NETWORKS LTD) [Y] 1-5* , abstract; paragraphs [0070] to [0079], [0086] to [0091], [0097] to [0110] & US 2012/0251109 A1 abstract; paragraphs [0094] to [0103], [0110] to [0115], [0121] to [0136] *; | [Y]CN103533464 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * , abstract; paragraphs [0081], [0128] to [0148]; fig. 11, 12 & WO 2015/035883 A1 * |