EP3224442 - SELF-CONTAINED EC IGU [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states View, Inc. 195 South Milpitas Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Stephen C. 131 12th Avenue San Mateo, California 94402 / US | 02 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Dhairya 1232 Golden Way Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 03 /
KLAWUHN, Erich R. 1465 Marlbarough Avenue Los Altos, California 94024 / US | 04 /
FRANK, Trevor 5557 Dunsburry Court San Jose, California 95123 / US | 05 /
SILKWOOD, Douglas 5710 La Seyne Place Santa Clara, California 95138 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/01] |
Former [2017/40] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15863112.7 | 24.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015US62480 | Priority number, date | US201462085179P | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462085179 P | US201562248181P | 29.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562248181 P | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016086017 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224442 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3224442 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E06B7/00, E06B9/24, E06B3/66, G02F1/163, G05B15/02 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
E06B9/24 (EP,CN,KR);
E06B3/6722 (KR);
G02F1/153 (EP);
G02F1/163 (EP,KR);
G05B15/02 (EP);
E06B2009/2464 (EP,CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | E06B7/00, E06B9/24, E06B3/66, G02F1/163 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME EC IGU | [2017/40] | English: | SELF-CONTAINED EC IGU | [2017/40] | French: | IGU EC AUTONOME | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 17.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22210169.3 / EP4177434 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
IT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011148218 (ROZBICKI ROBERT T [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0028] *; | [X]US2012293855 (SHRIVASTAVA DHAIRYA [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2648086 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17* paragraphs [0109] - [0112] *; | [A]US2014170863 (BROWN STEPHEN C [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0045] , [0068] * | International search | [XYA]US2012293855 (SHRIVASTAVA DHAIRYA [US], et al) [X] 1, 2, 9-22, 26, 27, 29 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0046], [0056], [0067], claims 1, 6-8, 15-22, and figures 1A-6B. * [Y] 3-7, 23-25, 28, 30-32 [A] 38-48, 54, 55, 57, 58 8, 33-37, 49-53, 56; | [A]WO2014082092 (VIEW INC [US], et al) [A] 1-58* See abstract, claims 1, 2, 10, and figures 2A-3A. *; | [Y]US2014170863 (BROWN STEPHEN C [US]) [Y] 30-32, 38-48 , 54, 55 , 57, 58 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0041], [0051], [0058], [0059], [0085] and figures 5A-7, 9A. *; | [Y]WO2014121809 (ISOCLIMA SPA [IT]) [Y] 3-7, 28 * See pages 13, 14 and figures 2, 3. *; | [Y]EP2357544 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK]) [Y] 23-25 * See paragraphs [0002], [0057] and figure 1. * |