EP3225163 - RADIOGRAPHY APPARATUS AND RADIOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2019/33] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSHIGE, Akira c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Wataru c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Nobuyuki c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 04 /
TEZUKA, Hidetake c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 05 /
HOSOKI, Tetsu c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | 06 /
GIDO, Tomonori c/o KONICA MINOLTA, INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2019/11] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
HIROSHIGE, Akira c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUSHITA, Wataru c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAKE, Nobuyuki c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | |||
04 /
TEZUKA, Hidetake c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | |||
05 /
HOSOKI, Tetsu c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | |||
06 /
GIDO, Tomonori c/o KONICA MINOLTA INC. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | Representative(s) | Higgs, Jonathan, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Higgs, Jonathan, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes, MK9 1NE / GB | ||
Former [2017/40] | Stanners, David Ralph Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15863347.9 | 19.10.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015JP79394 | Priority number, date | JP20140239692 | 27.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014239692 | [2017/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084517 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225163 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225163 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61B5/06, G01T7/00, H04N5/232, H04N5/32, H05G1/60, G16H40/63 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
A61B6/54 (EP,US);
A61B6/00 (EP,US);
A61B6/42 (EP,US);
A61B6/4233 (EP,US);
A61B6/4266 (US);
A61B6/4283 (EP,US);
A61B6/4405 (EP,US);
A61B6/4452 (EP,US);
A61B6/468 (EP,US);
A61B6/5294 (EP,US);
A61B6/545 (EP,US);
A61B6/547 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US);
A61B6/563 (US);
A61B6/566 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04N25/70 (EP,US);
H04N5/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | A61B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RADIOGRAFIEVORRICHTUNG UND RADIOGRAFIESYSTEM | [2017/40] | English: | RADIOGRAPHY APPARATUS AND RADIOGRAPHY SYSTEM | [2017/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE RADIOGRAPHIE ET SYSTÈME DE RADIOGRAPHIE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2017 | Translation filed | 03.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 03.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2015 | AL | 14.08.2019 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | IE | 19.10.2019 | LU | 19.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.10.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.10.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 19.10.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 19.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
AT | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009022276 (OHARA HIROMU [JP]) [Y] 1,2,12 * paragraphs [0266] , [ 121] , [ 237] , [ 260]; figure 5 * [A] 3-11; | [YA]US2014254758 (SAIGUSA AKIO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0248] * [A] 3-11; | [YA]US2014254759 (HARAGUCHI TOMOHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,12 * paragraphs [0027] , [0050] , [0061] , [0 62] * [A] 3-11; | [E]US2016022231 (NONAKA HIDEKI [JP]) [E] 1,12* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2014166556 (CANON KK) [Y] 6-10* , paragraph [0059] (Family: none) *; | [XYA]JP2014171542 (CANON KK) [X] 1-5, 12 * , paragraphs [0064] to [0074] & US 2014/0254759 A1 paragraphs [0075] to [0085] * [Y] 6-10 [A] 11 |