EP3225318 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL SEAMLESS PIPE OR TUBE USING A DEVICE ARRAY FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE OR TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/40] | DEVICE ARRAY FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE OR TUBE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL SEAMLESS PIPE OR TUBE USING SAME | ||
[2024/02] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Shunsuke c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KATSUMURA, Tatsuro c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 03 /
USHIDA, Hiroki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 04 /
KATO, Yasushi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3 Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15863394.1 | 07.10.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015JP05095 | Priority number, date | JP20140239449 | 27.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014239449 | [2017/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084298 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225318 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225318 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C21D6/00, C21D9/08, C21D8/10, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/42, C22C38/44, C22C38/46, C22C38/48, C22C38/50, C22C38/54, C22C38/58, C22C30/00, B21B19/04, B21B45/02, B21B17/08, B21B3/02 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C21D9/085 (EP,US);
B21B17/08 (EP,US);
B21B19/04 (EP,US);
B21B3/02 (EP,US);
B21B45/004 (US);
B21B45/02 (EP,US);
B21B45/0209 (US);
B21B45/0215 (US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/10 (EP,US);
C21D8/105 (EP,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/42 (EP,US);
C22C38/44 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/50 (EP,US);
C22C38/54 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
B21B2045/0227 (US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | B21B19/04, B21B3/02, B21B17/08, B21B45/02, C21D8/10, C21D9/08, C22C38/00, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NAHTLOSES ROHR ODER RÖHRE AUS DUPLEXSTAHL UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER VORRICHTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NAHTLOSEN STAHLROHRS ODER -RÖHRE | [2024/02] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL SEAMLESS PIPE OR TUBE USING A DEVICE ARRAY FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE OR TUBE | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TUYAU OU DE TUBE SANS SOUDURE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE DUPLEX À L'AIDE DE CET ENSEMBLE DE DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN TUYAU, OU UN TUBE, EN ACIER SANS SOUDURE | [2024/02] |
Former [2017/40] | VORRICHTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES NAHTLOSEN STAHLROHRS ODER -RÖHRE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NAHTLOSES ROHR ODER RÖHRE AUS DUPLEXSTAHL UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2017/40] | DEVICE ARRAY FOR MANUFACTURING SEAMLESS STEEL PIPE OR TUBE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR DUPLEX STAINLESS STEEL SEAMLESS PIPE OR TUBE USING SAME | ||
Former [2017/40] | ENSEMBLE DE DISPOSITIFS PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN TUYAU, OU UN TUBE, EN ACIER SANS SOUDURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TUYAU OU DE TUBE SANS SOUDURE EN ACIER INOXYDABLE DUPLEX À L'AIDE DE CE DERNIER | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2017 | Translation filed | 19.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 19.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS5891123 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [A]JPH0890043 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [XA]EP0842715 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]); | [A]EP2003216 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]); | [XA]CA2872342 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) | International search | [XA]JPH03267316 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]WO2007114077 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2013031865 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP); | [PX]JP2015086412 (JFE STEEL CORP) |