EP3228611 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROFLUOROOLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Inc. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2018/39] |
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xu c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
TERAZONO, Shinji c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
HAYASAKA, Yuki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Toshio c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 05 /
KAWAGUCHI, Satoshi c/o AsahiGlass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 06 /
KASAGAWA, Mitsugu c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15864619.0 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP83811 | Priority number, date | JP20140246810 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014246810 | [2017/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016088779 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228611 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/52, B01J23/44, B01J21/18, B01J37/08, C07C17/23, C07C21/18 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
C07C17/23 (EP,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,US);
B01J23/44 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J35/396 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/23, C07C21/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | C07C17/23, C07C21/18, B01J23/52, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROFLUOROLEFIN | [2017/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROFLUOROOLEFIN | [2017/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE HYDROFLUOROOLÉFINE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2017 | Translation filed | 08.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 13.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 26.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2011251442 (OKAMOTO HIDEKAZU [JP], et al); | [XY]US2011319678 (SEKI RYUJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2011319676 (TAKAGI HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2011319680 (KAWAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2011319681 (KAWAGUCHI SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [E]EP3187477 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP3187478 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [XY]WO2010074254 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2011162336 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011162339 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011162338 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011162337 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) |