EP3227470 - CORROSION INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARMATOV, Evgeny Borisovich Schlumberger Gould Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 02 /
GEDDES, Jill F. Schlumberger Gould Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 03 /
CRAWFORD, Lynne Patricia Schlumberger Gould Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 04 /
HUGHES, Trevor Lloyd Schlumberger Gould Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | 05 /
NAGL-VOGEL, Michaela Schlumberger Gould Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 15864760.2 | 19.10.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015US56144 | Priority number, date | GB20140021656 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: GB 201421656 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016089487 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227470 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/04, C23F11/08, C23F11/10, C23F11/12, C23F11/16, C23F11/173, C23F11/14, C09D5/08, C09K8/54, C09D7/63 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C23F11/04 (EP,GB,US);
C09D5/086 (EP,GB,US);
C09D7/48 (EP,US);
C09D7/63 (GB,US);
C09K8/54 (EP,US);
C23F11/14 (GB);
C23F11/141 (EP,US);
C23F11/149 (EP,US);
C23F11/165 (EP,US);
C09K2208/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | C23F11/00, C23F11/08, C23F11/10, C23F11/12, C23F11/16, C23F11/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | KORROSIONSHEMMUNG | [2017/41] | English: | CORROSION INHIBITION | [2017/41] | French: | INHIBITION DE LA CORROSION | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 30.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 30.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 05.08.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3081304 (ROGIER EDGAR R) [X] 1-5,8-11 * example -; claim - * [I] 15; | [Y]US3854959 (COSTAIN W, et al) [Y] 13,14 * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 3; claim - *; | [XYI]US3876371 (COSTAIN WINSTON, et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column 1, line 19 - column 2, line 32; examples 57, 76; claim - * [Y] 13,14 [I] 4,12-15; | [XI]GB1434354 (ICI LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-11 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 52; examples 1-7; claim - * [I] 4,12,15; | [IY]EP0212752 (SCHLUMBERGER DOWELL INC [US]) [I] 1-5,8-12,15 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 3; claim - * [Y] 13,14; | [XYI]US4734259 (FRENIER WAYNE W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 55; claim - * * column 1, lines 8-27 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 5,12,15; | [Y]WO2010023638 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 13,14 * claim - *; | [XI]CN102049213 (UNIV CHINA WEST NORMAL) [X] 1-4,10,11 * abstract * [I] 12,15; | [XI]CN101892042B (CHINA NAT OFFSHORE OIL CORP, et al) [X] 1-5,10,11 * paragraph [0034]; example -; claim - * [I] 12,15; | [XI]CN103865506 (SHANDONG TAIHE WATER TREAT CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * example -; claim - * [I] 12,15; | [XI]CN103014715B (UNIV JIANGSU SCIENCE & TECH) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11 * example -; claim - * [I] 12,15; | [XI] - G. L. FOSTER ET AL, "Acetylenic Corrosion Inhibitors", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, US, (19590701), vol. 51, no. 7, doi:10.1021/ie50595a027, ISSN 0019-7866, pages 825 - 828, XP055484868 [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11 * "Replacement of Hydroxyl Group";; table 1 * [I] 8,9,12-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie50595a027 | [XI] - N. I. PODOBAEV ET AL, "A Review of Acetylene Compounds as Inhibitors of Acid Corrosion of Iron", PROTECTION OF METALS., US, (20040101), vol. 40, no. 1, doi:10.1023/B:PROM.0000013105.48781.86, ISSN 0033-1732, pages 7 - 13, XP055484890 [X] 1-3,5,10,11 * "Nitrogen-Containing Acetylene Compounds"; page 8 * [I] 12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/B:PROM.0000013105.48781.86 | [X] - FERREIRA E S ET AL, "Evaluation of the inhibitor effect of L-ascorbic acid on the corrosion of mild steel", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, ELSEVIER SA, SWITZERLAND, TAIWAN, REPUBLIC OF CHINA, vol. 83, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHEMPHYS.2003.09.020, ISSN 0254-0584, (20040115), pages 129 - 134, (20031113), XP002555790 [X] 1,2,5,10,11 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchemphys.2003.09.020 | [A] - FINSGAR MATJAZ ET AL, "Application of corrosion inhibitors for steels in acidic media for the oil and gas industry: A review", CORROSION SCIENCE, (20140509), vol. 86, doi:10.1016/J.CORSCI.2014.04.044, ISSN 0010-938X, pages 17 - 41, XP028859076 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.corsci.2014.04.044 | International search | [A]US4028268 (SULLIVAN RD DANIEL S, et al) [A] 1-3 * See column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 2; and claim 1. *; | [A]US4734259 (FRENIER WAYNE W [US], et al) [A] 1-3* See column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 47; and claim 1. *; | [A]US5976416 (BREZINSKI MICHAEL M [NL]) [A] 1-3 * See column 4, lines 3-35; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2010261623 (CASSIDY JUANITA M [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0019]; and claims 1, 2. *; | [A]US2013112106 (MALWITZ MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0039]; and claim 1. * |