EP3227409 - STRIPPING VESSEL FOR REMOVING HYDROCARBONS ENTRAINED IN CATALYST PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMAS, Paolo Uop LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
CRAIG, Andrew Jonathan Uop LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/02] |
Former [2017/41] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 15866041.5 | 30.11.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015US62992 | Priority number, date | US201414561781 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US201414561781 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016089768 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3227409 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3227409 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01J19/32, B01J8/18, B01D45/00, // B01J8/34, B01J8/26, B01J38/06, B01J29/90 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B01J38/06 (EP,US);
B01J29/90 (EP,US);
B01J8/26 (EP,US);
B01J8/34 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00752 (US);
B01J2208/00761 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | C10G11/18, B01J19/32, B01J8/18, B01D45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSCHEIDUNGSGEFÄSS ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON IN KATALYSATORPARTIKELN MITGEFÜHRTEN KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN | [2017/41] | English: | STRIPPING VESSEL FOR REMOVING HYDROCARBONS ENTRAINED IN CATALYST PARTICLES | [2017/41] | French: | CUVE DE DÉCAPAGE POUR ÉLIMINER LES HYDROCARBURES ENTRAÎNÉS DANS DES PARTICULES DE CATALYSEUR | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 24.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005205467 (HEDRICK BRIAN W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraph [0040]; figures 4-6, 8; claim - * [I] 6-8,10; | [XI]US7077997 (SANDACZ MICHAEL S [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * figures 1, 2; claim - *[I] 6-8,10 | International search | [Y]US2005205467 (HEDRICK BRIAN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , fig. 4-6, [0032]-[0034] *; | [Y]US7077997 (SANDACZ MICHAEL S [US]) [Y] 1-10* , fig. 1-3, col. 6-7 * | by applicant | US4364905 | US4481103 | US5716585 | US6224833 | US6680030 | US2005205467 | US7077997 | US7332132 |