EP3229737 - INTRACARDIAC DEVICE TO CORRECT MITRAL REGURGITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Canniere, Didier 1295 N.W. 14th Street Miami, FL 33125 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Klang, Alexander H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15867432.5 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US64644 | Priority number, date | US201462089339P | 09.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462089339 P | US201514656006 | 12.03.2015 Original published format: US201514656006 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016094490 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3229737 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/2445 (EP,US);
A61F2/2454 (EP,US);
A61F2/2463 (EP,US);
A61F2/2448 (EP,US);
A61F2/2466 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | INTRAKARDIALE VORRICHTUNG ZUR KORREKTUR VON MITRALKLAPPENREGURGITATION | [2017/42] | English: | INTRACARDIAC DEVICE TO CORRECT MITRAL REGURGITATION | [2017/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTRACARDIAQUE POUR CORRIGER LA RÉGURGITATION MITRALE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 10.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2018/33] | 04.03.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002065554 (STREETER RICHARD B [US]) [A] 1-31* Entire document. *; | [A]US2003033009 (GABBAY SHLOMO [IL]) [A] 1-31 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2003069593 (TREMULIS WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * Entire document. *; | [X]US2005004668 (AKLOG LISHAN [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * Entire document, especially para[0035], para[0065], para[0077]- para[0078], para[0096]- para[0099], para[0105], para[0115]- para[0119] and FIGS. 1-6. *; | [X]US2006229708 (POWELL FEROLYN T [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * Entire document, especially Abstract, para[0091] and FIG. 10. *; | [X]WO2007009609 (BERNAL MARCO JOSE MANUEL [ES]) [X] 1-4 * Entire document, especially Abstract, p8, In 4-15, p9, In 3-20 and FIGS. 1-2. *; | [A]US2010076551 (DRAKE DANIEL H [US]) [A] 1-31 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2010174365 (PARRAVICINI ROBERTO ERMINIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-31 * Entire document. * |