EP3231523 - HEAT TREATMENT METHOD FOR AHSS HOT ROLLED COILS, AND COLD ROLLING METHOD USING SAME AND HEAT TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Geodong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Chang Kyu 3-4 Haengbokjutaek-gil 7beon-gil Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37662 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyeong Jeon 91 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57804 / KR | 03 /
YU, Ji Won 55 Hyoseong-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37836 / KR | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15867452.3 | 30.10.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015KR11554 | Priority number, date | KR20140175568 | 09.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140175568 | KR20140177699 | 10.12.2014 Original published format: KR 20140177699 | KR20150080524 | 08.06.2015 Original published format: KR 20150080524 | [2017/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016093493 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | KO | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231523 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B21B37/74, B21B45/00, B21B45/02, C21D9/56, C21D1/08, B21C47/26 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C21D1/25 (EP);
B21B37/74 (CN);
B21B45/0203 (CN);
B21C47/26 (EP);
C21D1/767 (EP);
C21D11/00 (EP);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D9/0006 (EP);
C21D9/0056 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C21D9/562 (CN);
C21D2221/02 (EP);
C21D2221/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR WARMGEWALZTE AHSS-SPULEN SOWIE KALTWALZVERFAHREN DAMIT UND WÄRMEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/42] | English: | HEAT TREATMENT METHOD FOR AHSS HOT ROLLED COILS, AND COLD ROLLING METHOD USING SAME AND HEAT TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2017/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE DE BOBINES LAMINÉES À CHAUD EN ACIER AVANCÉ À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE LAMINAGE À FROID LE METTANT EN UVRE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2016 | Translation filed | 15.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 15.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/51] | 12.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2076425 (BRITISH STEEL CORP) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2; claims 1-14 *; | [XA]US5820703 (SUZUKI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 20; claim 1; tables 1,2 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]EP1905851 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0011] , [0031] - [0045] - [0053]; claims 1-5 * [A] 2-9; | [A]US2010175452 (OHLERT JOACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* figures 1-6; claims 1-38 * | International search | [XY]JPH051330 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 22-29, 32-33 * See paragraphs [0007]-[0010], claim 1 and figure 1. * [Y] 30-31, 34-37; | [Y]KR20030053772 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1, 3-6 * See claim 1. *; | [YA]KR100617257B (POSCO [KR], et al) [Y] 11-15, 20 * See claim 1 and figure 3. * [A] 16-19, 21; | [Y]KR100854318B (HANIL INTERATE MACHINERY CO LT [KR]) [Y] 35-37* See paragraphs [0016]-[0021], claim 1 and figures 6-8. *; | [YA]KR20090096004 (POSCO [KR]) [Y] 1, 3-6 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0016], [0040]-[0048] and claims 3-5. * [A] 2, 7-10; | [Y]KR20110039664 (KIM JEONG HWAN [KR]) [Y] 11-15, 20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0024], claim 1 and figures 2, 7. *; | [Y]KR101259243B (POSCO) [Y] 30-31 * See paragraphs [0051]-[0055], [0072]-[0076] and figures 12, 14a. *; | [Y]KR101485657B (POSCO) [Y] 34 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0025] and figure 1. * |