EP3230474 - DETECTION OF TARGET NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES USING DIFFERENT DETECTION TEMPERATURES AND REFERENCE VALUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seegene, Inc. 8 Fl. 9 Fl. 91 Ogeum-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05548 / KR | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUN, Jong Yoon Rm. 1901 Cheongdam Mark-Hills 1-cha 21 Yeongdong-daero 142gil Gangnam-gu Seoul 06075 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Young Jo 115-1301 Park Rio Apt. 435 Olympic-ro Songpa-gu Seoul 05507 / KR | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15867540.5 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015KR13460 | Priority number, date | US201462089723P | 09.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462089723 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016093619 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230474 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G06F19/22 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6827 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G16B30/00 (EP,CN,US);
G16B30/10 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2527/107, C12Q2545/114, C12Q2547/101, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2563/107 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | DETEKTION VON ZIELNUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN MITHILFE UNTERSCHIEDLICHER DETEKTIONSTEMPERATUREN UND REFERENZWERTE | [2017/42] | English: | DETECTION OF TARGET NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES USING DIFFERENT DETECTION TEMPERATURES AND REFERENCE VALUES | [2017/42] | French: | DÉTECTION DE SÉQUENCES D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES CIBLES AU MOYEN DE DIFFÉRENTES TEMPÉRATURES DE DÉTECTION | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 07.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2010104768 (CANON US LIFE SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2012048207 (UNIV BRANDEIS [US], et al); | [XPI]WO2015147370 (SEEGENE INC [KR]); | International search | [A]KR101032750B (SEEGENE, INC.) [A] 1-28 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2011151461 (LINK JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2012202203 (REIS JR ARTHUR H [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * See abstract; and claims 1-21. *; | [A] - SANCHEZ, J. AQUILES et al., "Two-temperature LATE-PCR endpoint genotyping", BioMed Central (BMC) Biotechnology, vol. 6, no. 44, pages 1 - 14, XP021023580 [A] 1-28 * See abstract; and methods. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1472-6750-6-44 | [A] - CHAKRAVORTY et al., "Rapid detection of fluoroquinolone-resistant and heteroresistant Mycobacterium tuberculosis by use of sloppy molecular beacons and dual melting-temperature codes in a real-time PCR assay", Journal of Clinical Microbiology, (20110000), vol. 49, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1128/JCM.02271-10, pages 932 - 940, XP 055225174 [A] 1-28 * See the whole document. * |