EP3230374 - MULTIPLE LAYER INTERLAYER HAVING IMPROVED OPTICAL AND SOUND INSULATION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Jun 16 Stonehill Road East Longmeadow, MA 01028 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wenjie 40 Kestrel Lane Amherst, MA 01002 / US | 03 /
SCHILLING, Curtis, Louis, III 417 Arrowhead Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 04 /
D'ERRICO, John, Joseph 66 Mountain View Road Glastonbury, CT 06033 / US | 05 /
CUI, Weihong 5430 La Crescenta Avenue La Crescenta, CA 91214 / US | 06 /
LI, Zhou 59 Little Pond Road Northborough, MA 01532 / US | 07 /
HURLBUT, Jeffrey, B. 317 Dewey Street West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15868036.3 | 04.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015US63933 | Priority number, date | US201414563622 | 08.12.2014 Original published format: US201414563622 | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016094227 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230374 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3230374 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L29/14, C08K5/12, C08K5/15, C08J5/18 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10605 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B27/22 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/023 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/027 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2250/246 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/10 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/30 (EP,US);
B32B2307/40 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/418 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,US);
B32B2307/56 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
B32B2605/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE ZWISCHENSCHICHT MIT VERBESSERTEN OPTISCHEN UND SCHALLDÄMMENDEN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2017/42] | English: | MULTIPLE LAYER INTERLAYER HAVING IMPROVED OPTICAL AND SOUND INSULATION PROPERTIES | [2017/42] | French: | INTERCOUCHE MULTICOUCHE AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS OPTIQUES ET INSONORISANTES AMÉLIORÉES | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 19.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2015 | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | IT | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | MT | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | GB | 04.12.2022 | IE | 04.12.2022 | LU | 04.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
TR | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.12.2015 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
IE | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
GB | 04.12.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
LU | 04.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5593786 (PARKER ANTHONY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 1-4, 8 * * column 1, line 7 - line 24 * * column 2, line 35 - line 42 * * column 7, line 31 - line 56 ** column 8, line 41 - line 47 *; | [Y]US2010028642 (STEUER MARTIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0081] * * claim 1 * * tables 1-5 *; | [E]WO2016053701 (SOLUTIA INC [US]) [E] 1-5,7-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 003] , [ 005] , [ 007] , [ 010] * * paragraphs [0031] , [ 043] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0110] * * claims 1-10 * * tables 1-4 *; | EP3200994 [ ] (SOLUTIA INC [US]) | International search | [A]EP0457190 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claims 1 and 8. *; | [A]US5593786 (PARKER ANTHONY A [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See abstract; and claims 1-4 and 8. *; | [A]WO2006102049 (SOLUTIA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claims 1-2 and 6-11. *; | [A]US2010028642 (STEUER MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0030], [0034], [0060] and [0074]; claim 1; and Tables 1 and 3-6. *; | [A]US2013022824 (MEISE MARKUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; paragraph [0047]; and claims 1-6 and 13. * | Examination | EP3200994 | by applicant | US2282057 | US2282026 | US5190826 | US5340654 | US5728472 | US7510771 | US2010028642 | US2012133764 | WO2016053701 | EP3200994 | - "Vinyl Acetal Polymers", B.E. WADE, Encyclopedia of Polymer Science & Technology, (20030000), vol. 8, pages 381 - 399 |