EP3235512 - METHOD USING POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL TO PREPARE FIBROIN NANO/MICROSPHERES, AND APPLICATION OF METHOD IN CONTROLLED DRUG RELEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simatech Incorporation 2th floor, 204, Building B2 BioBay 218 Xinghu Street Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jianbing No. 218 Xinghu Street B2-204 Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jian No. 218 Xinghu Street B2-204 Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 15869318.4 | 15.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015CN97464 | Priority number, date | CN201410777934 | 16.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410777934 | CN201510918623 | 13.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510918623 | [2017/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016095811 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235512 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/42, A61K9/16 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
A61K9/19 (EP,CN);
C07K14/43586 (CN);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (CN);
A61K31/704 (CN);
A61K31/716 (CN);
A61K33/24 (CN);
A61K38/08 (CN);
A61K38/385 (CN);
A61K47/10 (CN);
A61K47/42 (US);
A61K9/0002 (CN);
A61K9/14 (CN);
A61K9/16 (US);
A61K9/1658 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN MIT POLYETHYLENGLYKOL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FIBROINNANO-/MIKROKUGELN UND ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS IN DER KONTROLLIERTEN WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2017/43] | English: | METHOD USING POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL TO PREPARE FIBROIN NANO/MICROSPHERES, AND APPLICATION OF METHOD IN CONTROLLED DRUG RELEASE | [2017/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ UTILISANT DU POLYÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL POUR PRÉPARER DES NANO/MICROSPHÈRES DE FIBROÏNE, ET APPLICATION DU PROCÉDÉ DANS LA LIBÉRATION CONTRÔLÉE DE MÉDICAMENT | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2017 | Translation filed | 16.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 16.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005123114 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0056] , [0058] , [0069] *; | [A]WO2008118133 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0034]; claims 1,2,21 *; | [A]WO2010057142 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-13* figure 1; examples 1-13; claims 9,26,27 *; | [I]WO2014059245 (UNIV TUFTS [US]) [I] 1-13 * page 54 no23, paragraph 211 - paragraph 218; figure 4 * | International search | [A]CN101244277 (UNIV SOOCHOW [CN]) [A] 1-13* , the whole document *; | [PX]CN104592375 (SUZHOU SIMEITE BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-13 * , the whole document * | [A] - BI, DIANZHOU;, PHARMACY, (19991130), page 465 [A] 1-13 |