EP3235565 - HONEYCOMB STRUCTURED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBIDEN Co., Ltd. 2-1 Kanda-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [2018/28] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Ltd. 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKAWA Hiroyuki 2189-302 Shimana Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-2655 / JP | 02 /
INOUE Masashi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 5-1 Sobiraki-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-8521 / JP | 03 /
KOIDE Nobuyuki 13-1-204 Aza-Kyoden Hirasawa Nikaho-shi Akita 018-0402 / JP | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 15870037.7 | 16.12.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015JP85279 | Priority number, date | JP20140255508 | 17.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014255508 | [2017/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016098835 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3235565 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24, B01D46/00, B01J35/04, B01D39/20, F01N3/022 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
B01D46/2474 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01D39/20 (EP,US);
B01D39/2093 (US);
B01D46/00 (EP,US);
B01D46/247 (US);
B01D46/2476 (EP,US);
B01D46/2482 (EP,US);
B01D46/2484 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | B01J35/04, B01D39/20, B01D46/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | WABENSTRUKTURKÖRPER | [2017/43] | English: | HONEYCOMB STRUCTURED BODY | [2017/43] | French: | CORPS À STRUCTURE EN NID-D'ABEILLES | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2017 | Translation filed | 17.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 17.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 09.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO2015133435 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [E]EP3115096 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-5 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] ** figures 9, 10 * | International search | [X]JPH08508199 (Stobbe, Per) [X] 1-5 * , claims; fig. 3 to 5; page 24, lines 1 to 3 & WO 1994/022556 A1 claims 1 to 40; fig. 3 to 5; page 21, line 32 to page 22, line 3 *; | [A]JP2004019498 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2004/0018123 A1 & EP 1371826 A2 & CN 1474043 A & KR 10-0517568 B1 *; | [A]JP2004042440 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2003/0041575 A1 & DE 10239286 A1 & FR 2829038 A1 *; | [X]JP2004321848 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0038], [0041]; fig. 4, 5; example 1 & US 2004/0206062 A1 fig. 4, 5; paragraphs [0062], [0067]; claims 1 to 22; example 1 & EP 1470852 A1 *; | [A]JP2005169249 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2005/0129907 A1 & EP 1541233 A1 *; | [A]JP2006272318 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-5* , entire text; all drawings & US 2006/0197252 A1 * |