EP3239970 - GAMMA VOLTAGE ADJUSTING CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR DRIVER CHIP AS WELL AS AMOLED DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kunshan Go-Visionox Opto-Electronics Co., Ltd. Building 4 No. 1 Longteng Road Development Zone KunShan City, Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Long No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 02 /
KAWASHIMA, Shingo No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Xiujian No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | 04 /
GE, Mingwei No.188 Chenfeng Road New&Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Kunshan Jiangsu 215300 / CN | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15871841.1 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015CN96087 | Priority number, date | CN201410811967 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: CN201410811967 | [2017/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016101772 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3239970 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/3233, G09G3/3291 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/3258 (US);
G09G3/32 (EP,US);
G09G3/3291 (EP,KR,US);
H04N5/202 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0828 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER GAMMASPANNUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR TREIBERCHIP SOWIE AMOLED-ANZEIGE | [2017/44] | English: | GAMMA VOLTAGE ADJUSTING CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR DRIVER CHIP AS WELL AS AMOLED DISPLAY | [2017/44] | French: | CIRCUIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE TENSION GAMMA POUR UNE PUCE DE PILOTE AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE AMOLED | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2017 | Translation filed | 10.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 10.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2020 | 16.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/49] | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2006251602 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]US2011074429 (LEVEY CHARLES I [US], et al) | International search | [A]JP2003223140 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [A]CN101231816 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [X]CN102347001 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD); | [X]CN103761956 (WUHAN JINGLI ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |