EP3237360 - COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED UREASE-INHIBITING EFFECT COMPRISING (THIO) PHOSPHORIC ACID TRIAMIDE AND FURTHER COMPOUNDS SUCH AS AMINES AND COLORANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMID, Markus Rieslingweg 2 67146 Deidesheim / DE | 02 /
ZERULLA, Wolfram Waasenweg 6 67487 St. Martin / DE | 03 /
PASDA, Gregor Carl Friedrich Giesstrasse 6 67434 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
WISSEMEIER, Alexander Schustergasse 6 67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
LANG, Tobias Im Linsenbühl 8 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 06 /
SCHNEIDER, Karl-Heinrich Am Kelleracker 20 67271 Kleinkarlbach / DE | 07 /
BAAN, Zoltan Claudius Lojetstrasse 13 67133 Maxdorf / DE | 08 /
STAAL, Maarten Deidesheimer Str.5 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 09 /
ALTENHOFF, Ansgar Gereon Rahmengasse 6 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 10 /
MOLAWI, Kian Wittelsbachstrasse 69 67061 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | 11 /
EBERT, Sophia Richard Wagnerstrasse 53 68165 Mannheim / DE | 12 /
FLEISCHEL, Olivier Rue du Commerce 18 67201 Eckbolsheim / FR | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15872070.6 | 22.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015IB59864 | Priority number, date | EP20140200088 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14200088 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016103168 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3237360 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C05G3/08, C05C9/00 | [2017/44] | CPC: |
C07F9/224 (EP,US);
A01N33/02 (RU);
C05G5/30 (EP,US);
C05C9/00 (RU);
C05G3/40 (RU);
C05G3/90 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTER UREASEHEMMENDER WIRKUNG MIT (THIO)PHOSPHORSÄURETRIAMID UND WEITEREN VERBINDUNGEN WIE AMINEN UND FARBSTOFFEN | [2017/44] | English: | COMPOSITIONS WITH IMPROVED UREASE-INHIBITING EFFECT COMPRISING (THIO) PHOSPHORIC ACID TRIAMIDE AND FURTHER COMPOUNDS SUCH AS AMINES AND COLORANTS | [2017/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PRÉSENTANT UN EFFET D'INHIBITION DE L'URÉASE AMÉLIORÉ COMPRENANT DU TRIAMIDE D'ACIDE (THIO)PHOSPHORIQUE ET AUTRES COMPOSÉS TELS QUE AMINES ET COLORANTS | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 20.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 08.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP20192607.8 Application withdrawn : 28.08.2020 | EP20193346.2 / EP3763691 | EP20193351.2 / EP3763692 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE102007062614 (FERTIVA GMBH [DE]); | [YA]EP2460404 (BASF SE [DE]); | [X]US8888886 (WHITEHURST GARNETT B [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3565599 (SOR KAMIL M, et al); | [A]US4517007 (SWERDLOFF MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US4539037 (SWERDLOFF MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [A]US5352265 (WESTON CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]CN1204310 (IMC AGRICO CO [US]); | [A]WO0061522 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE], et al); | [A]US6830603 (WHITEHURST GARNETT B [US], et al); | [A]CN1989144 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE]); | [A]CN101384523 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]CN101479282 (AGRA GROUP AS [CZ]); | [A]DE102009056566 (PIESTERITZ STICKSTOFF [DE]); | [X]US2011154874 (RAHN RALF-THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]CN102264748 ; | [PX]WO2015001391 (BASF SE [DE], et al) |