EP3239372 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AND MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR PARTIAL SPLIT-FIBER FIBER BUNDLE AND PARTIAL SPLIT-FIBER FIBER BUNDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHARA, Yoshihiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Tamotsu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 03 /
MIYOSHI, Katsuhiro c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15872723.0 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015JP84562 | Priority number, date | JP20140264432 | 26.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014264432 | JP20150071225 | 31.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015071225 | [2017/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016104154 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3239372 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3239372 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D02J1/18, B65H51/005, D01D11/02, D01D5/42 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
D01D11/02 (EP,US);
D02J1/18 (EP,KR,US);
B65H51/005 (KR,US);
D01D5/423 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | D02J1/18, B65H51/005 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR PARTIELLES SPALTFASER-FASERBÜNDEL UND PARTIELLES SPALTFASER-FASERBÜNDEL | [2017/44] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING AND MANUFACTURING DEVICE FOR PARTIAL SPLIT-FIBER FIBER BUNDLE AND PARTIAL SPLIT-FIBER FIBER BUNDLE | [2017/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION POUR FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE FIBRE CLIVÉE, ET FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE FIBRE CLIVÉE | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2017 | Translation filed | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.08.2020 | CY | 26.08.2020 | CZ | 26.08.2020 | DK | 26.08.2020 | EE | 26.08.2020 | FI | 26.08.2020 | HR | 26.08.2020 | LT | 26.08.2020 | LV | 26.08.2020 | MC | 26.08.2020 | MK | 26.08.2020 | MT | 26.08.2020 | NL | 26.08.2020 | PL | 26.08.2020 | RO | 26.08.2020 | RS | 26.08.2020 | SE | 26.08.2020 | SI | 26.08.2020 | SK | 26.08.2020 | SM | 26.08.2020 | TR | 26.08.2020 | BG | 26.11.2020 | NO | 26.11.2020 | GR | 27.11.2020 | IE | 09.12.2020 | LU | 09.12.2020 | IS | 26.12.2020 | PT | 28.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MK | 26.08.2020 | ||
MT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CY | 26.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
MT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
TR | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
MC | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SI | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SK | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 26.08.2020 | |
CZ | 26.08.2020 | ||
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
SM | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 26.08.2020 | |
DK | 26.08.2020 | ||
EE | 26.08.2020 | ||
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RO | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | DK | 26.08.2020 | |
FI | 26.08.2020 | ||
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
NL | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
HR | 26.08.2020 | ||
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
LV | 26.08.2020 | ||
PL | 26.08.2020 | ||
RS | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
IS | 26.12.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
GR | 27.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
SE | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 26.11.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | ||
PT | 28.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 26.08.2020 | |
LT | 26.08.2020 | ||
NO | 26.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2011241494 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0021] , [0022] , [0025] , [0027] , [0039] , [0041]; figures 2,3,4 * [I] 1-5,8-11; | [XI]US2012213997 (WANG CHEN-SHIH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-15 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0030] , [0031] , [0039]; figures 1a,1b,1c,2a,2b, * [I] 1-5,8-11 | International search | [XA]JP2011241494 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-4, 8-13, 16-20 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0003], [0013] to [0025], [0029] to [0031], [0039] to [0052]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) * [A] 5-7, 14, 15; | [XA]US2012213997 (WANG CHEN-SHIH [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 9-13, 16-20 * , paragraphs [0003], [0028] to [0042]; fig. 1A1 to 3D & DE 102012101077 A * [A] 5-8, 14, 15; | [XA]EP2687356 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [X] 1-4, 10-12, 16-20 * , paragraphs [0001], [0002], [0029], [0033], [0068] to [0072]; fig. 1 to 3, 8 & JP 2015-525836 A & JP 2015-527228 A & US 2015/0183184 A1 & US 2015/0204000 A1 & WO 2014/013137 A1 & WO 2014/013138 A1 & CA 2878032 A & CA 2879058 A & CN 104487233 A & CN 104487234 A & MX 2015000853 A & MX 2015000854 A * [A] 5-9, 13-15; | [A]JP2013525140 (Compositence GmbH) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0174969 A1 & WO 2011/128110 A1 & EP 2578384 A2 & DE 102010015199 A & CA 2795457 A & CN 102834248 A & DK 2442966 T & ES 2400505 T & KR 10-2013-0091648 A *; | [A]US3460416 (GILBERT DIXIE E) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2013057583 (TARKETT INC [CA]) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 2015-501391 A & US 2013/0098531 A1 & EP 2769008 A2 & AU 2012324547 A & CA 2852849 A & CN 103906866 A & KR 10-2014-0102648 A & RU 2014120181 A *; | [A]JPH11156852 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10292238 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings & US 6094791 A & WO 1998/045515 A1 & TW 385343 B & KR 10-2000-0016496 A *; | [A]JPH07227840 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-20 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |