EP3238309 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING POWER TO ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revive Electronics LLC 525 Congressional Boulevard Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUSTY, Joel, C. 12816 Whitebridge Drive Fishers, IN 46037 / US | 02 /
ZIELINSKI, Reuben, Q. 525 Congressional Blvd Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 03 /
MOOREHEAD, Scott 427 Springwood Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 04 /
TRUSTY, Micah, N. 5525 Shawnee Trail South Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | 05 /
DOUBERTEEN, David 9926 Sharsted Ct. Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | 06 /
EARLE, Mark 11210 Van Buren Pi Fishers, IN 46038 / US | [2018/10] |
Former [2017/44] | 01 /
TRUSTY, Joel, C. 12816 Whitebridge Drive Fishers, IN 46037 / US | ||
02 /
ZIELINSKI, Reuben, Q. 41 Rock Creek Woods Drive Lambertville, NJ 08530 / US | |||
03 /
MOOREHEAD, Scott 427 Springwood Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | |||
04 /
TRUSTY, Micah, N. 5525 Shawnee Trail South Indianapolis, IN 46220 / US | |||
05 /
DOUBERTEEN, David 9926 Sharsted Ct. Indianapolis, IN 46236 / US | |||
06 /
EARLE, Mark 11210 Van Buren Pi Fishers, IN 46038 / US | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/44] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15873786.6 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015US00239 | Priority number, date | US201462095997P | 23.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462095997 P | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016105505 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3238309 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02H5/08, G01N27/12, G06F1/32, H04M1/18 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H02H5/083 (EP,US);
H04M1/18 (EP,US);
G01N27/223 (EP,US);
H04M1/0262 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | H02H5/08, G01N27/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER LEISTUNG AN ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/44] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING POWER TO ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2017/44] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR COMMANDER L'ALIMENTATION VERS DES DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 21.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011279931 (NAKAMURA MASATSUGU [JP]) [X] 1,5,11,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0045] - [0060]; figure 4 * [I] 2,13; | [X]US2014307356 (HONG HYUN-JU [KR], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0 41] - [0043]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2014160680 (STEVENS BLAKE [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0035] - [0037]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0068]; figures 7,8 *; | [X]US2008013241 (WONG SHIH-FANG [TW], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]US2014130573 (ZIELINSKI REUBEN QUINCEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-139, 145-147 , 152-154, 167-170 , 174-177 * See paragraphs 28-42, 50, 80, claims 2, 13, 22-25, and figure 1. *; | [Y]US2011104940 (RABU STANLEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-139, 145-147 , 152-154, 167-170 , 174-177 * See paragraphs 5, 35-52, 81, claim 1, and figures 2, 5-8. *; | [A]WO2007019337 (RELLE LOUIS [US]) [A] 1-139, 145-147 , 152-154, 167-170 , 174-177 * See page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 4, claim 1, and figure 1A. *; | [A]JP2012191619 (SENSIRION AG) [A] 1-139, 145-147 , 152-154, 167-170 , 174-177 * See paragraphs 17-22, claims 1-2, and figures 1-4. *; | [A]US2012085324 (SAITO TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-139, 145-147 , 152-154, 167-170 , 174-177 * See paragraphs 34-38, claim 1, and figures 1A-1B. Note : For the claims 184(1), 185(1), the claims are renumbered by this auth ority because the claims 184-185 are found twice respectively. * | by applicant | US2011279931 | US2014307356 | US2014160680 |