EP3236890 - URINARY CATHETER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Government As Represented By The Department of Veterans Affairs Office of Research & Development 810 Vermont Avenue NW (10P9TT) Washington, District of Columbia 20420 / US | [2017/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICKEL, Eric Department of Veterans Affairs Office of Research&Development 810 Vermont Avenue NW (10P9TT) Washington, District of Columbia 20420 / US | [2017/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/44] | Application number, filing date | 15874262.7 | 21.12.2015 | [2017/44] | WO2015US67164 | Priority number, date | US201414579795 | 22.12.2014 Original published format: US201414579795 | [2017/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016106240 | Date: | 30.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236890 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/44, A61F5/442, A61M25/01 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A61M25/0111 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2210/1089 (EP,CN,US);
A61M25/0119 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/44] | A61F5/44, A61F5/442 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] | Title | German: | HARNKATHETERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2017/44] | English: | URINARY CATHETER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | [2017/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE CATHÉTER URINAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2017/44] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 28.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9638192 (BIDWELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11 * page 6, line 1 - line 24; figures 3,4,8 * [A] 4; | [XAI]US6007521 (BIDWELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 * [A] 5[I] 6,7; | [XAI]WO0183017 (WILSON COOK MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8-11 * page 12, paragraph second * * page 14, paragraph third - page 15, paragraph first * * page 22, paragraph second * * figure 4 * [A] 3,5 [I] 7 | International search | [A]US2012325692 (TANGHOJ ALLAN [DK], et al) [A] 1-13, 19 * See claim 1; figures la-8c. *; | [A]EP0909249 (MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES OF GEORGI [US]) [A] 1-13, 19 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2005124978 (KIM CHUL-JUN [KR]) [A] 1-13, 19 * See entire document. *; | [A]US2007270734 (CRISP WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1-13, 19 * See entire document. *; | [A]US6117120 (HEININGER ELISE [US]) [A] 1-13, 19 * See entire document. * |