EP3241417 - THERMAL MANAGEMENT OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elbit Systems Ltd. Advanced Technology Center Hof Hacarmel P.O. Box 539 3100401 Haifa / IL | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAIGERTSIK, Oleg 42a/3 HaNasi Ave. 3464304 Haifa / IL | 02 /
FISCHMAN, Alex 512 HaZait St. 2516700 Tal-El / IL | 03 /
ENGELMAN, Ian 8/3 Ya'ar Odem St. 2067408 Yoqneam Illit / IL | 04 /
KETTNER, Isaac Jak 15a Fierberg St. 3244737 Haifa / IL | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 15875363.2 | 11.11.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015IL51093 | Priority number, date | IL20140236544 | 31.12.2014 Original published format: IL 23654414 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016108223 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241417 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05K1/03, D03D15/12, // H05K3/42 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
H05K7/20563 (EP,KR,US);
D03D1/0082 (EP,US);
D03D11/00 (EP,US);
D03D15/267 (EP,US);
D03D25/005 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (KR,US);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
H05K1/09 (US);
H05K1/115 (US);
H05K3/0011 (US);
H05K3/42 (US);
H05K7/1422 (US);
H05K7/20163 (EP,KR,US);
H05K7/207 (US);
D10B2101/06 (EP,US);
H05K1/0201 (US);
H05K1/18 (US);
H05K2201/029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | H05K7/20, H05K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Title | German: | THERMISCHE VERWALTUNG VON LEITERPLATTENKOMPONENTEN | [2017/45] | English: | THERMAL MANAGEMENT OF PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD COMPONENTS | [2017/45] | French: | RÉGULATION THERMIQUE DE COMPOSANTS DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 10.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH0423386 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,9,10 [I] 5,6; | [XYI]US6447886 (MOHAMED MANSOUR H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * column 4, lines 19-33 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 24; figure - * [Y] 2-4,9,10[I] 5-7 | International search | [A]US5379193 (GALL THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 11-20* the whole document *; | [A]US6447886 (MOHAMED MANSOUR H [US], et al) [A] 11-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006087813 (BECKER WIREN D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009168346 (MIYOSHI TOYOKAZU [JP]) [X] 1-4, 9 * the whole document *; | [X]US2009195983 (REICHERT ARMIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012121487 (JEWELL-LARSEN NELS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2015061478 (HONDA MASAO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |