EP3240794 - ANTISENSE ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oregon State University 220 Nash Hall Corvallis, OR 97331-3804 / US | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 210 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [2021/24] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Oregon State University 220 Nash Hall Corvallis, OR 97331-3804 / US | ||
For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELLER, Bruce, L. 2932 NW Meldrum Ct. Bend, OR 97703 / US | 02 /
GREENBERG, David 408 Pecan Hollow Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [2021/24] |
Former [2017/45] | 01 /
GELLER, Bruce, L. 6994 N.W. Concord Drive Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | ||
02 /
GREENBERG, David 408 Pecan Hollow Drive Coppell, TX 75019 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/45] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15875820.1 | 23.12.2015 | [2017/45] | WO2015US00280 | Priority number, date | US201462098713P | 31.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462098713 P | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016108930 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3240794 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/712, // C07H19/16 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K38/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP,US);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | C07H19/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE ANTISENSE-VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2017/45] | English: | ANTISENSE ANTIBACTERIAL COMPOUNDS AND METHODS | [2017/45] | French: | COMPOSÉS ANTIBACTÉRIENS ANTISENS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 11.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.06.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004033972 (HORWITZ MARCUS A [US], et al) [A] 12-15 * paragraph [0094] *; | [Y]WO2008008113 (AVI BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,11-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009139635 (PROSENSA TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL], et al) [Y] 12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010016215 (MOULTON HONG M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2012064991 (AVI BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-7,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013074834 (SAREPTA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - R. P. WU ET AL, "Cell-penetrating peptides as transporters for morpholino oligomers: effects of amino acid composition on intracellular delivery and cytotoxicity", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 35, no. 15, doi:10.1093/nar/gkm478, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 5182 - 5191, XP055049876 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm478 | [T] - JAMES J. HOWARD ET AL, "Inhibition of Pseudomonas aeruginosa by peptide-conjugated phosphorodiamidate morpholino oligomers", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, US, (20170130), vol. 61, no. 4, doi:10.1128/AAC.01938-16, ISSN 0066-4804, pages e01938/1 - 16, XP055485237 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.01938-16 | International search | [A]US2012289457 (HANSON GUNNAR J [US]) [A] 1-3, 5-15, 22, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US8314072 (GELLER BRUCE L [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-15, 22, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2012296087 (SINHA SURAJIT [IN], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-15, 22, 23 * entire document *; | [A]US2013197220 (UEDA TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-3, 5-15, 22, 23* entire document * |