EP3244435 - CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Tatsuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
SHIMADA Tatsuya c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15876875.4 | 09.01.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015JP50470 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111000 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244435 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3244435 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/12, H01H71/50, H01H71/52 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
H01H71/12 (EP);
H01H71/123 (KR);
H01H71/525 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | H01H71/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTER | [2017/46] | English: | CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2017/46] | French: | DISJONCTEUR | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2017 | Translation filed | 29.03.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 29.03.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | ES | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | GB | 09.01.2020 | IE | 09.01.2020 | LU | 09.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.01.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
GB | 09.01.2020 | ||
IE | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
GB | 09.01.2020 | ||
IE | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
GB | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
GB | 09.01.2020 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0292841 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 4 - column 9, line 15; figures 1-11 *; | [X]GB2226451 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 1-3* page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 36; figure - *; | [X]US6727788 (LAWSON ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 18 - column 8, line 6; figure - * | International search | [A]JPS481988U (Mitsubishi Electric Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; fig. 2, 3 & EP 0292841 A2 & US 4888570 A *; | [A]JPH0836963 (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* , entire text; all drawings & US 5543595 A & GB 2286290 A & DE 19500221 A1 & FR 2715766 A1 *; | [A]JP2008097833 (KAWAMURA ELECTRIC INC) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; fig. 4 & CN 101154539 A & KR 10-2008-0029905 A * |