EP3244474 - ORIENTED APATITE-TYPE OXIDE ION CONDUCTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2019/41] |
Former [2017/46] | For all designated states Mitsui Mining and Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IDE, Shingo c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
ANNO, Yuichi c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 03 /
IZUTSU, Yasuhisa c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 04 /
OMURA, Jun c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 05 /
ISHII, Rintaro c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 06 /
KAHATA, Minoru c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2020/12] |
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
IDE, Shingo c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | ||
02 /
ANNO, Yuichi c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | |||
03 /
IZUTSU, Yasuhisa c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | |||
04 /
OMURA, Jun c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | |||
05 /
ISHII, Rintaro c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | |||
06 /
KAHATA, Minoru c/o Mitsui Mining&Smelting Co. Ltd. 1333-2 Haraichi Ageo-shi Saitama 362-0021 / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15876983.6 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015JP84515 | Priority number, date | JP20150001743 | 07.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015001743 | [2017/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111110 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244474 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3244474 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, C04B35/50, H01B1/06, H01B1/08, H01B13/00, H01M8/12, C01B33/20, C01B35/12, H01M4/88, H01M4/90 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C01B33/20 (EP,US);
H01M4/9033 (US);
C01B35/128 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (EP,US);
H01B1/06 (EP,US);
H01B1/08 (EP,US);
H01B13/00 (EP,US);
H01M4/8875 (US);
H01M8/02 (EP,US);
H01M8/12 (EP,US);
C01P2002/30 (US);
C01P2002/50 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | H01M8/02, C04B35/50, H01B1/06, H01B1/08, H01B13/00, H01M8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSGERICHTETER APATIT-OXIDIONENLEITER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/46] | English: | ORIENTED APATITE-TYPE OXIDE ION CONDUCTOR AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2017/46] | French: | CONDUCTEUR PAR IONS OXYDE DE TYPE APATITE ORIENTÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2017 | Translation filed | 16.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 07.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2015 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | IE | 09.12.2020 | LU | 09.12.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 09.12.2015 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 09.12.2020 | ||
LU | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013052445 (NAKADA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0036] *; | [IA]JP2013184862 (NAGOYA INST TECHNOLOGY, et al) [I] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0001] * * claim 1 * [A] 3-6; | [A]JP2014148443 (NAGOYA INST TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A] - KOICHIRO FUKUDA ET AL, "Combined Effect of Germanium Doping and Grain Alignment on Oxide-Ion Conductivity of Apatite-Type Lanthanum Silicate Polycrystal", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20120622), vol. 24, no. 13, doi:10.1021/cm301484q, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 2611 - 2618, XP055476513 [A] 1-7 * "Conclusion"; page 2617 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm301484q | [A] - WANG SEA-FUE ET AL, "Effects of Nb5+, Mo6+, and W6+dopants on the germanate-based apatites as electrolyte for use in solid oxide fuel cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, (20130801), vol. 38, no. 27, doi:10.1016/J.IJHYDENE.2013.06.123, ISSN 0360-3199, pages 12015 - 12023, XP028694441 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijhydene.2013.06.123 | [A] - KOICHIRO FUKUDA ET AL, "Oxide-Ion Conductivity of Highly c -Axis-Oriented Apatite-Type Lanthanum Silicate Polycrystal Formed by Reactive Diffusion between La 2 SiO 5 and La 2 Si 2 O 7", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (20111227), vol. 23, no. 24, doi:10.1021/cm2029905, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 5474 - 5483, XP055476510 [A] 1-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm2029905 | International search | [A]JP2004327210 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , claims 2 to 5; paragraphs [0039], [0047] to [0053], [0093] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005126269 (HYOGO PREFECTURE) [A] 1-2, 7 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0007] to [0016] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2006118177 (SHINKOSHA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-2, 7 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0040] & EP 1876269 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0040] *; | [PA]JP2015185321 (AISIN SEIKI) [PA] 1-7* , claim 1; paragraphs [0019], [0022], [0031] to [0035] (Family: none) * |