EP3244058 - NOZZLE PLATE FOR FUEL INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enplas Corporation 30-1, Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0034 / JP | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGUCHI, Koji c/o Enplas Corporation 30-1 Namiki 2-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0034 / JP | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 15877022.2 | 21.12.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015JP85605 | Priority number, date | JP20150003316 | 09.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015003316 | [2017/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111149 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3244058 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/18, F02M61/16 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
F02M61/1853 (EP,US);
F02M61/162 (EP,US);
F02M61/18 (EP,US);
F02M61/1833 (US);
F02M61/184 (US);
F02B23/104 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/46] | F02M61/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Title | German: | DÜSENPLATTE FÜR KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG | [2017/46] | English: | NOZZLE PLATE FOR FUEL INJECTION DEVICE | [2017/46] | French: | PLAQUE DE BUSE POUR DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2017 | Translation filed | 28.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 28.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/31] | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006220017 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-6,8-11 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1,2,9 * * abstract *; | [Y]JP2012193713 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 1-6,8-11 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]JPH10507240 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP) [A] 1-11 * figures 4,8,9 * * abstract *; | [A]JP2004340121 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figure 7 * * abstract * | International search | [YA]JP2006220017 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-6, 8-11 * , paragraphs [0009], [0012] to [0013], [0025] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 2, 9 (Family: none) * [A] 7; | [Y]JP2012193713 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 1-6, 8-11 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0015], [0023]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH10502131 (Robert Bosch GmbH) [Y] 11 * , page 5, lines 1 to 2; fig. 1 & US 5924634 A column 16, lines 55 to 57; fig. 1 & WO 1996/030644 A1 & EP 1184565 A2 & DE 19607266 A1 & CN 1147844 A *; | [Y]WO2014185290 (ENPLAS CORP [JP]) [Y] 11 * , paragraph [0018]; fig. 4 & JP 2015-132253 A paragraph [0018]; fig. 4 & CN 105190020 A *; | [A]JP2004176690 (DENSO CORP, et al) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0009], [0013] to [0015]; fig. 2 to 5 & US 2004/0104285 A1 paragraphs [0052], [0056], [0058] to [0059]; fig. 1, 3 to 4, 5A to 5C & DE 10355707 A *; | [A]JPH10507240 (Siemens Automotive Corp.) [A] 1 * , page 6, lines 11 to 13; page 8, line 10 to page 9, line 10; fig. 6 to 9 & US 5570841 A column 2, lines 4 to 6; column 3, lines 5 to 37; fig. 6 to 9 & WO 1996/011335 A1 *; | [A]JP2004340121 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [A] 1 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0018]; fig. 1 to 2 & US 2004/0217204 A1 paragraphs [0058] to [0060]; fig. 1, 2A to 2B * |