EP3243189 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF WAGERING ON A PLURALITY OF EVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exacta Systems, LLC 220 Great Circle Road Suite 130 Nashville, TN 37228 / US | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARONSON, Thomas, L. 318 35th Street West Palm Beach, FL 33407 / US | 02 /
NEELY, Patrick 2742 Avalon Way Jupiter, FL 33458 / US | 03 /
ROSE, Glen, M. 1306 Beacon Circle Wellington, FL 33414 / US | 04 /
STEIN, Jeremy, F. 2232 Widener Terrace Wellington, FL 33414 / US | 05 /
LIND, Jefferson, C. 10508 Double Spur Loop Austin, TX 78759 / US | 06 /
ENZMINGER, Joseph, R. 3109 Maywood Avenue Austin, TX 78703 / US | [2017/46] | Representative(s) | CSY London Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/46] | CSY London 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15877358.0 | 28.12.2015 | [2017/46] | WO2015US67688 | Priority number, date | US201562100242P | 06.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562100242 P | [2017/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016111870 | Date: | 14.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243189 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32, A63F1/00 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
G07F17/3288 (EP,US);
G07F17/3211 (EP,US);
G07F17/3225 (EP,US);
G07F17/3244 (EP,US);
G07F17/3246 (EP,US);
G07F17/3272 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM WETTEN AUF EINER VIELZAHL VON EREIGNISSEN | [2017/46] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF WAGERING ON A PLURALITY OF EVENTS | [2017/46] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PARI SUR UNE PLURALITÉ D'ÉVÉNEMENTS | [2017/46] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 31.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 15.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US6120376 (CHERRY ERIC [US]) [Y] 1-7, 12-15, 30-36 , 40-43 * See column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 67, column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 45; claims 5, 19, 24; and figure 3. *; | [Y]US2006246990 (DOWNES DAVID W [US]) [Y] 1-7, 12-15, 30-36 , 40-43 * See paragraphs [0028], [0034], [0053], [0056]. *; | [A]JP2008104546 (ARUZE CORP) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 30-36 , 40-43* See paragraphs [0028]-[0043]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2010120538 (DEWITT GREGORY T [US]) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 30-36 , 40-43 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0049]; and figure 1. *; | [A]US2013053991 (FERRARO III JOSEPH W [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 12-15, 30-36 , 40-43 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0035]; and figure 2. * |