EP3091102 - CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/45] | HARD COATING, CUTTING TOOL, AND HARD COATING MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
[2022/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Hardmetal Corp. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi, Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2016/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASEUTH, Anongsack c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 776 Aza Naie Naie-cho Sorachi-gun Hokkaido 079-0304 / JP | 02 /
DETANI, Takanori c/o SUMITOMO ELECTRIC HARDMETAL CORP. 776 Aza Naie Naie-cho Sorachi-gun Hokkaido 079-0304 / JP | [2016/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/45] | Application number, filing date | 15877908.2 | 30.09.2015 | [2016/45] | WO2015JP77696 | Priority number, date | JP20150005295 | 14.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015005295 | [2016/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016113956 | Date: | 21.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3091102 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3091102 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/34, B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16, B23D77/00, B23F21/00, B23G5/06, C23C16/52, C23C28/04, C23C16/44, C23C30/00 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
C23C30/005 (EP,KR);
C23C16/34 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/148 (US);
C23C16/44 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/56 (KR);
B23B2228/04 (US);
B23B2228/10 (KR);
B23B2228/105 (US);
B23C2228/10 (KR);
B23F21/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/536 (US);
B32B2307/58 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | C23C16/34, B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16, B23D77/00, B23F21/00, B23G5/06, C23C16/52, C23C28/04, C23C16/44 | ||
Former IPC [2017/38] | C23C16/34, B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16, B23D77/00, B23F21/00, B23G5/06, C23C16/52, C23C28/04 | ||
Former IPC [2016/45] | C23C16/34, B23B27/14, B23B51/00, B23C5/16, B23D77/00, B23F21/00, B23G5/06, C23C16/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/42] | English: | CUTTING TOOL AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME | [2022/42] | French: | OUTIL DE COUPE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/42] |
Former [2016/45] | HARTBESCHICHTUNG, SCHNEIDWERKZEUG UND HARTBESCHICHTUNGSHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2016/45] | HARD COATING, CUTTING TOOL, AND HARD COATING MANUFACTURING METHOD | ||
Former [2016/45] | REVÊTEMENT DUR, OUTIL DE COUPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE REVÊTEMENT DUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2016 | Translation filed | 05.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 27.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | ES | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | IT | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | FR | 30.09.2023 | GB | 30.09.2023 | IE | 30.09.2023 | LU | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
FR | 30.09.2023 | ||
GB | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
GB | 30.09.2023 | ||
IE | 30.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
LU | 30.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
ES | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004110039 (HORLING ANDERS [SE], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0018] , [0044]; table 2 *; | [X] - TODT J ET AL, "Superior oxidation resistance, mechanical properties and residual stresses of an Al-rich nanolamellar Ti0.05Al0.95N coating prepared by CVD", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140711), vol. 258, doi:10.1016/J.SURFCOAT.2014.07.022, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 1119 - 1127, XP029020164 [X] 7-10 * Experiments * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surfcoat.2014.07.022 | International search | [A]JP2011516722 (Kennametal Inc.) [A] 1-10* , claims & US 2010/0323176 A1 all claims & WO 2009/112115 A1 & EP 2252721 A & DE 102008013965 A & CA 2717187 A & MX 2010009890 A & KR 10-2010-0122918 A & CN 101970717 A & RU 2010141746 A & BR PI0908924 A *; | [A]JP2013510946 (Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Forderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.) [A] 1-10 * , claims & US 2012/0219789 A1 all claims & WO 2011/058132 A1 & EP 2499275 A & DE 102009046667 A & CN 102686772 A & KR 10-2012-0102076 A & RU 2012123952 A *; | [A]JP2014129562 (SUMITOMO ELEC HARDMETAL CORP) [A] 1-10 * , claims & WO 2014/103533 A1 & EP 2940181 A & CN 104870685 A *; | [A]JP2014133267 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-10 * , claims (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2008545063 | JP2014129562 | - I. ENDLER ET AL., "Novel aluminum-rich Ti Al N coatings by LPCVD", SURFACE & COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 203, pages 530 - 533 | - J. KECKES ET AL., "Self-organized periodic soft-hard nanolamellae in polycrystalline TiAIN thin films", THIN SOLID FILMS, (2013), vol. 545, pages 29 - 32 | - X-sen Ouryoku Sokutei Hou, YOKENDO CO., LTD., (1981), pages 54 - 67 |