EP3252882 - CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT, DC POWER SUPPLY CONNECTOR, AND DC POWER SUPPLY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2017/49] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Tadashi c/o SONY COMPUTER SCIENCE LABORATORIES INC. 3-14-13 Higashi-gotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15880035.9 | 26.05.2015 | [2017/49] | WO2015JP65071 | Priority number, date | JP20150016273 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015016273 | JP20150056005 | 19.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015056005 | JP20150094751 | 07.05.2015 Original published format: JP 2015094751 | [2017/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016121140 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3252882 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/703, H01H9/54, H01H33/59, H01H47/00 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
H01H9/542 (EP,US);
H01H9/54 (KR);
H02H9/025 (US);
H01H33/59 (KR);
H01H47/00 (KR);
H01R13/703 (KR);
H01H2009/546 (EP,US);
H01H50/54 (EP,US);
H01H9/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | STROMBEGRENZUNGSSCHALTUNG, VERBINDER FÜR GLEICHSTROMNETZTEIL UND GLEICHSTROMNETZTEIL | [2017/49] | English: | CURRENT LIMITING CIRCUIT, DC POWER SUPPLY CONNECTOR, AND DC POWER SUPPLY DEVICE | [2017/49] | French: | CIRCUIT DE LIMITATION DE COURANT, CONNECTEUR D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT CONTINU, ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT CONTINU | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2017 | Translation filed | 24.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 13.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005294080 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG, et al) [A] 1-5,7,8* abstract *; | [Y]JP2013168347 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2014154904 (STROBL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5,7,8 * sentence 26 - sentence 33; figures 1,3,4 * | International search | [XYA]JP2004158331 (TOSHIBA ENGINEERING CO) [X] 1, 9, 17 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0015]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-6, 10-14, 18-22, 30-37 [A] 7, 8, 15, 16, 23-29, 38, 39; | [A]JP2009206066 (DAITO COMM APPARATUS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-39* , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010088143 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 6, 14, 22 * , paragraph [0013] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014522088 (Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH) [Y] 2-6, 10-14, 18-22, 33-37 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0028]; fig. 1, 2 & US 2014/0154904 A1 & EP 2742565 A1 *; | [Y]JP2014179189 (WAKAZUKI NOBORU) [Y] 30-37 * , paragraph [0011] (Family: none) * |