EP3147012 - CIRCULATING DYNAMIC VEHICLE VIEWING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Oct Vision Inc. Backside Building A No.1 Xiangshan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jian Backside Building A No.1 Xiangshan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
WEN, Hongguang Backside Building A No.1 Xiangshan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
JIA, Baoluo Backside Building A No.1 Xiangshan Road Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Hellmich, Wolfgang European Patent and Trademark Attorney Lortzingstrasse 9 / 2. Stock 81241 München / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15880788.3 | 06.03.2015 | [2017/13] | WO2015CN73755 | Priority number, date | CN20151054940 | 03.02.2015 Original published format: CN201510054940 | [2017/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016123833 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3147012 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3147012 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A63J25/00, A63G21/20, A63G7/00, A63G31/16, A63G31/12, A63G21/14 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
A63J25/00 (EP,US);
A63G31/02 (EP,US);
A63G31/16 (EP,US);
A63G7/00 (EP,US);
A63J5/00 (US);
A63J5/12 (US);
A63J2005/002 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | A63J25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIRKULIERENDES DYNAMISCHES FAHRZEUGBETRACHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/13] | English: | CIRCULATING DYNAMIC VEHICLE VIEWING SYSTEM | [2017/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE VISUALISATION DE VÉHICULE DYNAMIQUE DE CIRCULATION | [2017/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | Translation filed | 21.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/13] | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2015 | AL | 05.02.2020 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | IE | 06.03.2020 | LU | 06.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | FR | 05.04.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | GB | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | DE | 01.10.2020 | [2023/06] |
Former [2022/31] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MK | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GB | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AL | 05.02.2020 | ||
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GB | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GB | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
GB | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
FR | 05.04.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
DE | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003106455 (WESTON DENISE CHAPMAN [US]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-12; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]JP3434886B (ORIENTAL SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US2005048446 (FROMYER STEPHEN F [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-13 * * claims 1-19 * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]CN201643742U (LIUAN JINLING HAPPY WORLD ENTERTAINMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [Y]CN202636200U (GUANGZHOU KENYANYOU ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-10* figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US2013017893 (FEUER ROLAND [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figures 1-4; claims 1-23 * | International search | [A]US2010062866 (SCHNUCKLE GARY W [US]) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [A]CN202636200U (GUANGZHOU KENYANYOU ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN103341271 (SHANGHAI DYNAFORCE AUTOMATION SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0021]-[0031], and figures 1-4 * |