EP3267499 - COMPOSITION FOR FORMING LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY, LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/02] | COMPOSITION FOR FORMING LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY, LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2019/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co., Ltd. 6-28, Rokubancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8465 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | For all designated states Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co., Ltd. 6-28, Rokubancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8465 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKA, Takeshi c/o Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd. 6-28 Rokubancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8465 / JP | 02 /
HARADA, Kenji c/o Sumitomo Osaka Cement Co. Ltd. 6-28 Rokubancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8465 / JP | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15884490.2 | 06.03.2015 | [2018/02] | WO2015JP56643 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016142992 | Date: | 15.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267499 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3267499 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/20, H01L33/56, // H01L33/50, H01L33/58 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
H01L33/56 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR,US);
H01L33/504 (US);
C08G59/4246 (US);
C08K9/02 (KR,US);
C08K9/04 (KR);
C08K9/06 (US);
H01L33/501 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/52 (KR);
H01L33/58 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/011 (KR);
H01L2933/0091 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | H01L33/58, H01L33/52, C08K3/20 | ||
Former IPC [2018/02] | H01L33/58, H01L33/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR FORMUNG EINES LICHTSTREUUNGSVERBUNDKÖRPERS, LICHTSTREUUNGSVERBUNDKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/02] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR FORMING LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY, LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2019/18] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR FORMATION D'UN CORPS COMPOSITE DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE, CORPS COMPOSITE DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/18] |
Former [2018/02] | COMPOSITION FOR FORMING LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY, LIGHT SCATTERING COMPOSITE BODY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2018/02] | COMPOSITION POUR LA FORMATION D'UN CORPS COMPOSITE DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE, CORPS COMPOSITE DE DIFFUSION DE LUMIÈRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2017 | Translation filed | 25.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 25.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2015 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 06.03.2020 | LU | 06.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.03.2015 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2014179565 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [A] 1* paragraphs [0018] , [0022] , [0025] , [0042] - [0043] - [0056]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2015021643 (KURINO YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,5-8 * paragraphs [0309] , [0341] , [0349] , [0370] - [0377] - [0212]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JP2005252222 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 2* , paragraph [0022]; fig. 1 & US 2008/0149945 A1 & WO 2005/022654 A2 & EP 1658642 A & TW 001384637 B *; | [Y]WO2007049573 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0345]; fig. 1 to 3 & US 2009/0140284 A1 & EP 1950239 A1 & CN 101296982 A & KR 10-2008-0066692 A & TW 001401287 B *; | [Y]JP2008120848 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0078] (Family: none) *; | [XY]WO2013172476 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1, 3-7 * , paragraphs [0001] to [0139]; fig. 1, 2 & CN 104271495 A & TW 201402674 A * [Y] 2 |