EP3273333 - INFORMATION DEVICE CONTROL METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America 20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200 Torrance, CA 90503 / US | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Kumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMIYA, Akiko c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
IAI, Kahoru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/04] | Application number, filing date | 15885332.5 | 27.11.2015 | [2018/04] | WO2015JP05886 | Priority number, date | US201562135350P | 19.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562135350 P | JP20150083297 | 15.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015083297 | [2018/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016147234 | Date: | 22.09.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273333 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273333 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0484, G05B15/02, H02J13/00, H02J3/14, H04L12/28 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H02J13/00004 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F3/04886 (US);
H02J13/00 (US);
H02J13/00001 (EP,US);
H02J13/00028 (EP,US);
H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/2816 (US);
H04L12/2823 (US);
H04L12/2827 (EP,US);
H04M11/00 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (US);
H02J2310/14 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (US);
Y02B70/3225 (US);
Y04S20/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | G06F3/0484, H04M11/00, H04Q9/00, H04L12/28 | ||
Former IPC [2018/04] | G06F3/0484, H04M11/00, H04Q9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVORRICHTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND INFORMATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/04] | English: | INFORMATION DEVICE CONTROL METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INFORMATION DEVICE | [2018/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF D'INFORMATION, PROGRAMME ET DISPOSITIF D'INFORMATION | [2018/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2017 | Translation filed | 12.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 17.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2015 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | GB | 27.11.2019 | IE | 27.11.2019 | LU | 27.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | FR | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 27.11.2015 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
GB | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
FR | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 27.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2010033455 (CANON KK) [A] 1-19* , paragraphs [0024] to [0026]; fig. 8 & US 2010/0026647 A1 paragraphs [0040] to [0042]; fig. 8 *; | [A]JP2013109668 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC) [A] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0028] to [0035]; fig. 3 & US 2013/0132873 A1 paragraphs [0036] to [0043]; fig. 3 & EP 2597559 A2 & CN 103197878 A *; | [Y]JP2013525878 (Apple Inc.) [Y] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0078], [0170] to [0173]; fig. 5S to 5W & WO 2011/126501 A1 paragraphs [0092], [0184] to [0187]; fig. 5S to 5W & CN 102033710 A & KR 10-2013-0016329 A *; | [Y]JP2013218419 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-19 * , paragraph [0113]; fig. 9 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2015008408 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) [Y] 1-19 * , paragraphs [0061] to [0076], [0091] to [0093]; fig. 7, 8, 11 & US 2015/0261427 A1 paragraphs [0132] to [0147], [0162] to [0164]; fig. 7, 8, 11 *; | [Y] - NOBUKI GOTO, "Technical Report Jutaku-yo Energy Monitor System", Clean Energy, (20100910), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 0918-7510, pages 53 - 56, XP009501056 [Y] 1-19 * , particularly, page 55 * |