EP3281143 - MODIFYING WEB PAGE CODE TO INCLUDE CODE TO PROTECT OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entit Software LLC 1140 Enterprise Way, Building G Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Ming Sum Sam 1111 King's Road Taikoo Shing 19/Fl. Cityplaza One Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
MUNOZ, Alvaro Vicente Aleixandre 1 Parque Empresarial Las Rozas 28232 Las Rozas / ES | 03 /
MIROSH, Oleksandr Naberezhno-Kreshchatitskaya str. 5/13 Kiev Kyiv Oblast 04070 / UA | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15888682.0 | 10.04.2015 | [2018/07] | WO2015US25277 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016164036 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281143 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/56, G06F21/50, G06F21/54, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/52 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/54 (EP,US);
G06F21/52 (EP,US);
H04L63/1466 (EP,US);
H04L63/1483 (EP,US);
G06F2221/032 (US);
G06F2221/033 (US);
G06F8/41 (US);
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L67/2895 (EP,US);
H04L67/561 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/07] | G06F21/56, G06F21/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERUNG EINES WEBSEITENCODES ZUR EINBEZIEHUNG EINES CODES ZUM SCHUTZ DER AUSGABE | [2018/07] | English: | MODIFYING WEB PAGE CODE TO INCLUDE CODE TO PROTECT OUTPUT | [2018/07] | French: | MODIFICATION DU CODE D'UNE PAGE WEB POUR INCLURE DU CODE SERVANT À PROTÉGER UNE SORTIE | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 14.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2012023394 (PIECZUL OLGIERD [IE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,13 * figures 3,6,7 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 45] - [0053] * [I] 4,5,9-12,15; | [A] - WEINBERGER JOEL ET AL, A Systematic Analysis of XSS Sanitization in Web Application Frameworks, MEDICAL IMAGE COMPUTING AND COMPUTER-ASSISTED INTERVENTION - MICCAI 2015 : 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, MUNICH, GERMANY, OCTOBER 5-9, 2015; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, CH, (20110912), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-319-24946-9, XP047433978 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-23822-2_9 | International search | [A]US2006259973 (SIMA CALEB [US], et al) [A] 1-15* See paragraph [0067]; and figure 5. *; | [Y]US7451352 (MOORE ANTHONY J [US], et al) [Y] 4-5, 7, 9-10, 12 , 14-15 * See column 17, lines 61-65; column 18, lines 4-8; and figures 1, 15. *; | [Y]US2011197180 (HUANG YAO-WEN [TW], et al) [Y] 5, 10 * See paragraph [0046]; and figure 4. *; | [A]WO2011154454 (IBM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See page 24, lines 1-26; and figures 3, 5. *; | [XY]US2014373087 (CIU WEIDONG [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 6, 8, 11, 13 * See paragraphs [0016]-[0017], [0020], [0024], [0027], [0031], [0037]-[0038]; claims 1, 12, 18; and figures 1-2. * [Y] 4-5, 7, 9-10, 12 , 14-15 |