EP3348676 - ALUMINUM ELECTROLYZER ELECTRODE AND VARIANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/29] | ALUMINUM ELECTROLYZER ELECTRODE (VARIANTS) | ||
[2024/19] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states (Obshchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennost'Yu "Obedinennaya Kompaniya Rusal Inzhen-Erno- Tekhnologicheskiy Tsentr) Ul. Pogranichnikov 37 str. 1 G. Krasnoyarsk 660111 / RU | [2024/23] |
Former [2018/29] | For all designated states (Obshchestvo S Ogranichennoy Otvetstvennost'Yu "Obedinennaya Kompaniya Rusal Inzhen-Erno- Tekhnologicheskiy Tsentr) Ul. Pogranichnikov 37 str. 1 G. Krasnoyarsk 660111 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMAKOV, Dmitriy Aleksandrovich ul. Alekseeva 109 kv. 76 Krasnoyarsk 660077 / RU | 02 /
GUSEV, Aleksandr Olegovich Akademgorodok 23 kv. 101 Krasnoyarsk 660036 / RU | [2018/29] | Representative(s) | Atalay, Baris Alfa Patent Stan Advoka Ltd. Co. Dumen Sok Gumussuyu Is Merkezi, No: 11, Kat: 4 34427 Beyoglu/Istanbul / TR | [2024/23] |
Former [2018/29] | Tobiasz-Dumania, Katarzyna, et al Baker & McKenzie Krzyzowski i Wspolnicy sp. k. Rondo ONZ 1 00-124 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 15890044.9 | 23.04.2015 | [2018/29] | WO2015RU00264 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016171580 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | RU | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3348676 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3348676 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 27.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25C3/08, C04B35/58, C04B35/563, C04B35/56, C22B21/00, C22C19/07, C25C3/12, C22C32/00, B22F7/00, B22F7/08, C22C1/10, C22C1/04, C23C28/00, C23C28/04, // C22C38/00 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
C22C19/07 (EP,US);
C25C3/08 (RU);
C25C3/125 (US);
B22F7/004 (EP);
B22F7/008 (EP);
B22F7/08 (EP);
C04B41/51 (US);
C04B41/88 (US);
C22C1/047 (EP);
C22C1/1026 (EP);
C22C32/0052 (EP);
C22C32/0057 (EP);
C22C32/0073 (EP);
C23C28/00 (EP);
C23C28/04 (EP);
C23C28/042 (EP);
C23C28/048 (EP);
C25B11/043 (US);
C25B11/055 (US);
C25C3/12 (EP,US);
C25C3/18 (US);
C22C38/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/14] | C25C3/08, C22B21/00, C04B35/56, C04B35/563, C04B35/58, C04B35/65, C04B41/51, C22C1/04, C22C29/00, C22C29/14, C22C32/00, C25D3/66 | ||
Former IPC [2018/29] | C25C3/08, C22B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALUMINIUM-ELEKTROLYSEURELEKTRODE UND VARIANTEN | [2024/19] | English: | ALUMINUM ELECTROLYZER ELECTRODE AND VARIANTS | [2024/19] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR ÉLECTROLYSEUR D'ALUMINIUM ET DES VARIANTES | [2024/19] |
Former [2018/29] | ALUMINIUM-ELEKTROLYSEURELEKTRODE (VARIANTEN) | ||
Former [2018/29] | ALUMINUM ELECTROLYZER ELECTRODE (VARIANTS) | ||
Former [2018/29] | ÉLECTRODE POUR ÉLECTROLYSEUR D'ALUMINIUM (ET VARIANTES) | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2018 | Translation filed | 01.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/29] | 08.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2018/29] | 31.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/29] | 30.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 01.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4529494 (JOO' LOUIS A [US], et al); | [A]EP0633871 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU]); | [A]US2002092774 (BATES CALVIN [US], et al); | [A]US6533909 (DURUZ JEAN-JACQUES [CH], et al); | [A]EP1694884 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]); | [A]EP2140044 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU]); | [XY]CN101724861 (ALUMINUM CORP OF CHINA LTD); | [A]EP2459775 (ALCOA INC [US]); | [YA]TW201500326 (NAT UNIV TSING HUA [TW]) | International search | [Y]RU2031189 (SHULGIN LORIS P [RU], et al); | [A]US6267866 (GLESENER JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]CN1986897 (UNIV GUIZHOU [CN]); | [DY]WO2008132590 (MOLTECH INVENT SA [LU], et al); | [A]CN101724861 (ALUMINUM CORP OF CHINA LTD); | [Y]RU2012107070 ; | [YA]RU2013108797 ; | [Y]RU2013141551 | Examination | EP0633871 | EP2140044 | EP2459775 | by applicant | US3697390 | US3827954 | WO9320027 | RU2135643 | CN1807693 | WO2008132590 | CN101724861 | RU2452798 | RU2518032 | TW201500326 |