EP3290838 - AIR CHANNEL ASSEMBLY AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hefei Midea Refrigerator Co., Ltd. No. 669 West Changjiang Road Hefei, Anhui 230601 / CN | For all designated states Midea Group Co., Ltd. B26-28F, Midea Headquarter Building No. 6 Midea Avenue Beijiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528311 / CN | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Libin No.669 West Changjiang Road Hefei Anhui 230601 / CN | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 15890476.3 | 15.06.2015 | [2018/10] | WO2015CN81492 | Priority number, date | CN201510222134 | 30.04.2015 Original published format: CN201510222134 | CN201520281957U | 30.04.2015 Original published format: CN 201520281957 U | [2018/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016173097 | Date: | 03.11.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290838 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3290838 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/14, F25D17/06, // F25D25/02 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
F25D21/14 (EP,US);
F25D17/065 (US);
F25D17/062 (EP,US);
F25D2317/063 (EP,US);
F25D2317/067 (EP,US);
F25D2321/142 (EP,US);
F25D25/025 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/10] | F25D21/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTKANALANORDNUNG UND KÜHLSCHRANK DAMIT | [2018/10] | English: | AIR CHANNEL ASSEMBLY AND REFRIGERATOR HAVING SAME | [2018/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE CANAL D'AIR ET RÉFRIGÉRATEUR LE COMPORTANT | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2017 | Translation filed | 09.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 09.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2015 | AL | 02.09.2020 | AT | 02.09.2020 | CY | 02.09.2020 | CZ | 02.09.2020 | DK | 02.09.2020 | EE | 02.09.2020 | FI | 02.09.2020 | HR | 02.09.2020 | LT | 02.09.2020 | LV | 02.09.2020 | MC | 02.09.2020 | MK | 02.09.2020 | PL | 02.09.2020 | RO | 02.09.2020 | RS | 02.09.2020 | SE | 02.09.2020 | SI | 02.09.2020 | SK | 02.09.2020 | SM | 02.09.2020 | NL | 23.09.2020 | BG | 02.12.2020 | NO | 02.12.2020 | GR | 03.12.2020 | IS | 02.01.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 15.06.2015 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CY | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 15.06.2015 | |
AL | 02.09.2020 | ||
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
NL | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
MC | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
DK | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SI | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SK | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 02.09.2020 | |
AT | 02.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2020 | ||
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
IS | 02.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
SM | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 02.09.2020 | |
EE | 02.09.2020 | ||
FI | 02.09.2020 | ||
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RO | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
HR | 02.09.2020 | ||
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
LV | 02.09.2020 | ||
PL | 02.09.2020 | ||
RS | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
GR | 03.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
SE | 02.09.2020 | ||
BG | 02.12.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 02.09.2020 | |
LT | 02.09.2020 | ||
NO | 02.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR321682 (KOELKEBECK CARL WILLIAM AUGUST [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figures 5-7, 17 * [I] 6,9,10; | [A]DE19500369 (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,10* abstract *; | [X]JP2007071487 (HITACHI APPLIANCES INC) [X] 1,10 * abstract *; | [I]US7266958 (MILDE BERTRAM [DE], et al) [I] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]CN202361734U (HISENSE RONSHEN GUANGDONG REFRIGERATORS CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * figure 6 *; | [I]CN202692580U (BSH ELEC APPLIANCES JIANGSU CO) [I] 1,2,10 * abstract *; | [X]CN203704507U (HISENSE SHANDONG REFRIGERATOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,10 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH10238933 (HOSHIZAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]EP1162420 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-10* , the whole document *; | [A]CN202393158U (YOUCAI LUO) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN202770109U (NINGBO JINGEAO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *; | [X]CN203704507U (HISENSE SHANDONG REFRIGERATOR CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * , description, paragraphs [0028]-[0041], and figures 3-9 * |